SFC Licences of WONG Choi Mei 王彩美
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
BLVSIN Capital Limited 動力勢能資本有限公司 | RE | 9 | 22 July 2019 | 01 January 2021 |
BLVSIN Capital Limited 動力勢能資本有限公司 | RE | 4 | 22 July 2019 | 01 January 2021 |
BLVSIN Capital Limited 動力勢能資本有限公司 | RE | 1 | 22 July 2019 | 01 January 2021 |
Bright Fund Management Limited 光明投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 20 February 2019 | 23 June 2019 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 20 February 2019 | 23 June 2019 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 20 February 2019 | 23 June 2019 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 February 2019 | 23 June 2019 |