SFC Licenceholders of BLVSIN Capital Limited 動力勢能資本有限公司
- info@blvsin.com
- Website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHOY Chi Ting, Eva 蔡志婷 | RE | 9 | 30 November 2021 | 15 December 2023 |
CHOY Chi Ting, Eva 蔡志婷 | RE | 4 | 30 November 2021 | 15 December 2023 |
CHOY Chi Ting, Eva 蔡志婷 | RE | 1 | 30 November 2021 | 15 December 2023 |
CHUNG Koon Wah, Jonathan 鍾冠華 | RO | 9 | 12 June 2019 | 22 May 2024 |
CHUNG Koon Wah, Jonathan 鍾冠華 | RO | 4 | 12 June 2019 | 22 May 2024 |
CHUNG Koon Wah, Jonathan 鍾冠華 | RO | 1 | 12 June 2019 | 22 May 2024 |
HO Shan Shan Rosanna 何珊珊 | RE | 4 | 18 October 2019 | 30 September 2023 |
HO Shan Shan Rosanna 何珊珊 | RE | 1 | 18 October 2019 | 30 September 2023 |
HO Shan Shan Rosanna 何珊珊 | RE | 9 | 10 September 2019 | 30 September 2023 |
HO Yan Lam 何欣霖 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2019 | 31 January 2020 |
HO Yan Lam 何欣霖 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2019 | 31 January 2020 |
HO Yan Lam 何欣霖 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2019 | 31 January 2020 |
LAU Chi Wai, Michael 劉志偉 | RO | 4 | 28 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 |
LAU Chi Wai, Michael 劉志偉 | RO | 1 | 28 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 |
LI Ho Fung 李可鋒 | RO | 9 | 13 June 2024 | |
LI Ho Fung 李可鋒 | RO | 4 | 13 June 2024 | |
LI Ho Fung 李可鋒 | RO | 1 | 13 June 2024 | |
LI Ho Fung 李可鋒 | RE | 9 | 22 May 2024 | 13 June 2024 |
LI Ho Fung 李可鋒 | RE | 4 | 22 May 2024 | 13 June 2024 |
LI Ho Fung 李可鋒 | RE | 1 | 22 May 2024 | 13 June 2024 |
LIE Ka Hin 李嘉軒 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2019 | 06 March 2023 |
LIE Ka Hin 李嘉軒 | RE | 4 | 05 December 2019 | 06 March 2023 |
LIE Ka Hin 李嘉軒 | RE | 1 | 05 December 2019 | 06 March 2023 |
LUK Michael Wai Hoe | RE | 9 | 05 August 2021 | 31 August 2023 |
LUK Michael Wai Hoe | RO | 4 | 07 January 2021 | 31 August 2023 |
LUK Michael Wai Hoe | RO | 1 | 07 January 2021 | 31 August 2023 |
LUK Michael Wai Hoe | RO | 9 | 07 January 2021 | 05 August 2021 |
LUK Michael Wai Hoe | RE | 4 | 23 November 2020 | 07 January 2021 |
LUK Michael Wai Hoe | RE | 1 | 23 November 2020 | 07 January 2021 |
POON Hon Wai 潘漢威 | RE | 1 | 01 March 2021 | 31 January 2024 |
POON Hon Wai 潘漢威 | RE | 4 | 01 March 2021 | 31 January 2024 |
POON Hon Wai 潘漢威 | RE | 9 | 01 March 2021 | 31 January 2024 |
SHI Xuewei 施雪薇 | RO | 9 | 08 April 2024 | |
SHI Xuewei 施雪薇 | RO | 4 | 08 April 2024 | |
SHI Xuewei 施雪薇 | RO | 1 | 08 April 2024 | |
SHI Xuewei 施雪薇 | RE | 9 | 14 March 2024 | 08 April 2024 |
SHI Xuewei 施雪薇 | RE | 4 | 14 March 2024 | 08 April 2024 |
SHI Xuewei 施雪薇 | RE | 1 | 14 March 2024 | 08 April 2024 |
TANG Yuk Sang 鄧煜生 | RE | 9 | 07 May 2020 | 23 May 2020 |
TANG Yuk Sang 鄧煜生 | RE | 4 | 07 May 2020 | 23 May 2020 |
TANG Yuk Sang 鄧煜生 | RE | 1 | 07 May 2020 | 23 May 2020 |
TONG Kai Cheong 湯啟昌 | RE | 4 | 08 June 2021 | 01 January 2024 |
TONG Kai Cheong 湯啟昌 | RE | 1 | 08 June 2021 | 01 January 2024 |
TSE Chiu Lai 謝肖麗 | RO | 9 | 12 June 2019 | 31 January 2024 |
TSE Chiu Lai 謝肖麗 | RO | 4 | 12 June 2019 | 31 January 2024 |
TSE Chiu Lai 謝肖麗 | RO | 1 | 12 June 2019 | 31 January 2024 |
TSUI Chek Ming 徐澤明 | RE | 9 | 17 September 2020 | 24 November 2020 |
TSUI Chek Ming 徐澤明 | RE | 4 | 17 September 2020 | 24 November 2020 |
TSUI Chek Ming 徐澤明 | RE | 1 | 17 September 2020 | 24 November 2020 |
WAN Chuen Fai 尹銓輝 | RO | 9 | 12 June 2019 | 21 March 2022 |
WAN Chuen Fai 尹銓輝 | RO | 4 | 12 June 2019 | 21 March 2022 |
WAN Chuen Fai 尹銓輝 | RO | 1 | 12 June 2019 | 21 March 2022 |
WAN Ka Yan Vivian 尹嘉欣 | RO | 1 | 12 June 2019 | 18 December 2019 |
WONG Choi Mei 王彩美 | RE | 9 | 22 July 2019 | 01 January 2021 |
WONG Choi Mei 王彩美 | RE | 4 | 22 July 2019 | 01 January 2021 |
WONG Choi Mei 王彩美 | RE | 1 | 22 July 2019 | 01 January 2021 |