SFC Licences of YIM Wai Leung 嚴煒亮
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 08 February 2023 | 21 September 2023 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RO | 3 | 25 October 2016 | 08 February 2023 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RO | 3 | 09 September 2011 | 31 December 2013 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 September 2011 |