SFC Licenceholders of Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司
- support@empfs.com
- Website
- www.empfs.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AO IEONG Miu Yee, Matilda 歐陽妙儀 | RE | 3 | 18 October 2006 | 29 September 2007 |
AU Chi Ho 區志豪 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 March 2023 |
AU Ka Wah, Andy 區家華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 April 2014 |
AU YEUNG Chi Yip 歐陽志業 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 21 February 2006 |
AU YEUNG Chi Yip 歐陽志業 | RE | 3 | 04 July 2006 | 31 July 2024 |
AU Yiu Kuen 歐耀權 | RE | 3 | 08 May 2006 | 31 December 2006 |
CHAN Chi Cheung 陳智翔 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 September 2013 |
CHAN Hau chung 陳厚忠 | RE | 3 | 04 June 2010 | |
CHAN Ho Sang, Tony 陳浩笙 | RE | 3 | 30 June 2005 | 15 October 2017 |
CHAN Ka Hung, Jason 陳家鴻 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 13 June 2005 |
CHAN Ka Wai 陳嘉偉 | RE | 3 | 10 March 2014 | 30 September 2022 |
CHAN Kai Tai 陳啓泰 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 April 2018 |
CHAN Kin Man 陳健民 | RE | 3 | 01 February 2013 | 19 September 2014 |
CHAN King Hong 陳敬康 | RE | 3 | 26 January 2004 | 01 July 2017 |
CHAN King Tak 陳敬德 | RE | 3 | 16 November 2022 | |
CHAN King Tak 陳敬德 | RO | 3 | 09 February 2021 | 16 November 2022 |
CHAN King Tak 陳敬德 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 February 2021 |
CHAN Kwok Chue 陳國柱 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 24 June 2003 |
CHAN Kwun Chi 陳觀志 | RE | 3 | 09 September 2005 | 21 January 2006 |
CHAN Lai Sha 陳麗莎 | RE | 3 | 30 April 2008 | 16 October 2013 |
CHAN Lap Kwok, Alvin 陳立國 | RE | 3 | 06 March 2007 | 03 April 2007 |
CHAN Man Chun, Laurence 陳文俊 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 September 2022 |
CHAN Man Sun 陳文新 | RE | 3 | 17 March 2006 | 02 May 2006 |
CHAN Mei Fung 陳美鳳 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 May 2022 |
CHAN Mei Yee 陳美儀 | RE | 3 | 17 May 2004 | 22 July 2019 |
CHAN Pak Lam, Tom 陳柏楠 | RO | 3 | 19 March 2008 | 01 April 2010 |
CHAN Pak Lam, Tom 陳柏楠 | RO | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 March 2007 |
CHAN Pak Ming 陳栢明 | RE | 3 | 02 November 2007 | 31 January 2009 |
CHAN Pat 陳筆 | RE | 3 | 14 June 2006 | 17 January 2007 |
CHAN Pui Cheung 陳沛彰 | RE | 3 | 16 June 2005 | 06 October 2005 |
CHAN Sai Ko, Timothy 陳世浩 | RE | 3 | 21 July 2004 | 24 May 2006 |
CHAN Sai Lap 陳世立 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 January 2016 |
CHAN Sau Chi 陳秀枝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 September 2007 |
CHAN Sin Yee 陳倩儀 | RO | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2017 |
CHAN Suk Wan, Brenda 陳淑雲 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
CHAN Tin Ho 陳靝豪 | RE | 3 | 24 May 2019 | 20 June 2019 |
CHAN Tin Ho 陳靝豪 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 March 2012 |
CHAN Wai Tak 陳偉德 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 17 October 2003 |
CHAN Wai To 陳偉濤 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2014 |
CHAN Wai Yan 陳偉仁 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 March 2014 |
CHAN Wang Pong 陳宏邦 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 March 2005 |
CHAN Wing Ki 陳穎琪 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 January 2004 |
CHAN Wing Man, Katherine 陳詠汶 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 January 2010 |
CHAN Yau Wai 陳又維 | RE | 3 | 25 May 2009 | 21 August 2009 |
CHAN Yau Wai 陳又維 | RE | 3 | 17 July 2006 | 15 August 2007 |
CHANG Ho Yin 張浩然 | RE | 3 | 07 June 2013 | 13 August 2018 |
CHAU Ling 周凌 | RE | 3 | 15 December 2006 | 01 January 2007 |
CHAU Sophia 周玟秀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
CHAU Tsang Wu 周錚瑚 | RE | 3 | 17 October 2008 | |
CHAU Yuk Ling 周玉玲 | RE | 3 | 10 September 2009 | 17 December 2016 |
CHAU Yuk Yin 鄒玉賢 | RE | 3 | 28 December 2004 | 31 December 2014 |
CHEN Jing 陳晶 | RE | 3 | 14 July 2009 | 21 January 2010 |
CHENG Chun Tung 鄭振東 | RE | 3 | 30 April 2009 | 09 January 2012 |
CHENG Fuk Kam, David 鄭福鑫 | RE | 3 | 28 November 2017 | 11 June 2020 |
CHENG Fuk Kam, David 鄭福鑫 | RE | 3 | 08 December 2009 | 01 January 2017 |
CHENG Hau Yi 鄭巧儀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
CHENG Ka Wai 鄭嘉偉 | RE | 3 | 11 July 2013 | 30 August 2014 |
CHENG Kam Cheong 鄭錦昌 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 13 November 2003 |
CHENG Kam Luen 鄭錦鑾 | RE | 3 | 17 August 2006 | 01 March 2007 |
CHENG Man Kit, Drason 鄭文傑 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 April 2017 |
CHENG Sin Ling 鄭倩伶 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 November 2021 |
CHENG Wing Ching 鄭永正 | RE | 3 | 07 March 2007 | 22 April 2017 |
CHEUK Pan Tei 卓彬地 | RE | 3 | 03 December 2013 | 21 July 2014 |
CHEUNG Chung Wa 張頌華 | RE | 3 | 14 June 2004 | 04 February 2005 |
CHEUNG Chung Yiu 張重堯 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 12 June 2020 |
CHEUNG Ka Yeung 張家揚 | RE | 3 | 30 August 2012 | 31 March 2014 |
CHEUNG Kar Wai 張家偉 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 June 2019 |
CHEUNG Kay Lok 張基樂 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 August 2022 |
CHEUNG Kim Kong 張劍剛 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 18 January 2019 |
CHEUNG King Lung 張境隆 | RE | 3 | 28 January 2008 | 03 June 2014 |
CHEUNG Koon Hung 張冠雄 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 22 April 2003 |
CHEUNG Lai Ping 張麗萍 | RE | 3 | 12 March 2009 | 01 August 2012 |
CHEUNG Mei Lam 張美林 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
CHEUNG Ming Wai 張明衛 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 13 October 2007 |
CHEUNG Pak Yau 張柏友 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2004 |
CHEUNG Pui Yee, Milk 張佩儀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
CHEUNG Wing Kwan 張榮坤 | RE | 3 | 06 April 2009 | |
CHEUNG Woon Chuen, Sangdy 張煥泉 | RO | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 April 2017 |
CHIK Yuet Ming 戚月明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 October 2017 |
CHIU Cheuk Wai, Eva 趙卓慧 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
CHIU Kam Yuen 趙金源 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2013 |
CHIU Ying Nam 邱瑩籃 | RE | 3 | 26 August 2008 | 10 May 2010 |
CHIU Ying Nam 邱瑩籃 | RE | 3 | 11 August 2004 | 02 October 2007 |
CHIU Yu Hin 趙宇軒 | RE | 3 | 20 May 2015 | 29 November 2021 |
CHOI Kai Wai, Kevin 蔡啟偉 | RE | 3 | 28 December 2004 | 05 March 2007 |
CHOI Kam Tung 蔡錦東 | RE | 3 | 19 June 2009 | 02 April 2010 |
CHOI Kang Hung 蔡鏡雄 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 May 2011 |
CHONG Ho Man 莊浩民 | RE | 3 | 04 May 2011 | 22 September 2016 |
CHONG Kwan 莊群 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2018 |
CHOW Shou Mo, Michael 周修武 | RE | 3 | 02 September 2021 | |
CHOW Shou Mo, Michael 周修武 | RO | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 August 2021 |
CHOW Sin Lai 鄒仙麗 | RE | 3 | 29 February 2012 | 11 August 2017 |
CHOW Siu Hung 周小雄 | RE | 3 | 28 March 2006 | 20 March 2009 |
CHOW Yu Hin 周宇軒 | RE | 3 | 16 March 2010 | 01 June 2011 |
CHOY Hau Man 蔡孝文 | RE | 3 | 21 August 2007 | 17 December 2008 |
CHOY Po Yin, Iris 蔡寶燕 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 December 2011 |
CHUI Chung Kwan 徐頌君 | RE | 3 | 21 December 2005 | 01 April 2017 |
CHUN Man Wa 秦敏華 | RE | 3 | 21 November 2008 | 28 February 2018 |
CHUNG Chan 鍾陳 | RE | 3 | 28 December 2004 | 05 January 2024 |
CHUNG Cheuk Lam 鍾焯林 | RE | 3 | 07 June 2016 | 22 June 2018 |
CHUNG Ka Ki 鍾家祺 | RE | 3 | 18 June 2008 | 31 December 2009 |
CHUNG Kwong San 鍾廣燊 | RE | 3 | 28 November 2007 | 16 May 2016 |
CHUNG Lai Yin 鍾禮賢 | RO | 3 | 10 February 2021 | 22 April 2022 |
CHUNG Lai Yin 鍾禮賢 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 10 February 2021 |
CHUNG Man Him, James 鍾文謙 | RE | 3 | 26 June 2006 | 20 December 2007 |
CHUNG Wai Fong 鍾惠芳 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 March 2014 |
CHUNG Wing Sing 鍾穎成 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 September 2006 |
DOO Hak Wai, Barry 都克威 | RE | 3 | 05 August 2004 | 06 February 2010 |
FAN Man Chun 范文雋 | RE | 3 | 26 June 2006 | 30 April 2007 |
FONG Chui Lan 方翠蘭 | RE | 3 | 13 April 2004 | 08 May 2018 |
FONG Heung Ching 方向正 | RE | 3 | 21 June 2007 | 13 August 2012 |
FONG Kam Biu 方錦彪 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
FUNG Ka Faat 馮家發 | RE | 3 | 31 May 2012 | 28 January 2013 |
HO Chi Man, Jacky 何志文 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 April 2017 |
HO Chi Wai 何智威 | RE | 3 | 05 August 2016 | 03 June 2017 |
HO Chi Wai 何智威 | RE | 3 | 19 April 2004 | 03 October 2015 |
HO Chi Wing 何志榮 | RE | 3 | 21 September 2004 | 14 October 2005 |
HO Hin Chun Firsef 何顯俊 | RE | 3 | 25 November 2015 | 31 March 2023 |
HO Ka Fai 何家輝 | RE | 3 | 24 December 2009 | 14 November 2010 |
HO Ka Yiu 何嘉耀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 December 2013 |
HO Kai Yin 何啟賢 | RE | 3 | 11 October 2007 | 14 January 2011 |
HO Kit Chai 何傑仔 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2008 |
HO Kwai Keung 何貴強 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
HO Po Chu 何寶珠 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 March 2014 |
HO Pui Fong 何佩芳 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
HO Suk Wah, Anson 何淑華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
HO Tik Sang, Dickson 何狄生 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 17 August 2018 |
HO Wai Chun 何惠珍 | RE | 3 | 25 May 2011 | 13 November 2013 |
HO Yiu Ming 何耀明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 October 2017 |
HON Ka Chun 韓嘉駿 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2005 |
HONG Yat Fai 康日輝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 September 2017 |
HONG Yung Tat, Stephen 匡庸達 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 16 January 2018 |
HOU Sik Mo 侯錫武 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 12 March 2010 |
HSU Sheung Kwong 許湘江 | RE | 3 | 06 April 2005 | 23 August 2005 |
HUI Kam Kwong 許淦光 | RE | 3 | 27 February 2014 | 28 March 2015 |
HUI Wai Kong 許偉剛 | RE | 3 | 08 April 2005 | 12 September 2005 |
HUI Wai Wa 許偉華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 July 2017 |
HUNG Fung Ngor 洪鳳娥 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 March 2015 |
HUNG Kut Hon 洪吉漢 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 19 August 2004 |
HUNG Mei Heung 洪美香 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 11 February 2010 |
HUNG Virginia 洪倩兒 | RE | 3 | 19 March 2008 | 30 December 2011 |
HWANG Huey Chyi 黃慧琪 | RE | 3 | 31 July 2008 | 13 January 2010 |
IP Chak Ming 葉澤銘 | RE | 3 | 02 January 2004 | |
IP Hon Man, Andy 葉漢文 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 April 2018 |
IP Pui Lan 葉佩蘭 | RE | 3 | 07 June 2007 | |
KAI Kwok Ming 奚國明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 January 2009 |
KAM Wo Ping 金和平 | RE | 3 | 28 February 2017 | 24 September 2017 |
KEE Man Kit 紀文傑 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 07 May 2007 |
KO Ka Wai 高嘉慧 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 October 2017 |
KOK Ho Lun 郭浩倫 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 02 February 2005 |
KOK Joe Sum, Samuel 谷祖森 | RE | 3 | 06 April 2005 | 29 May 2007 |
KONG Kwai Lan, Joanna 江桂蘭 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 22 July 2019 |
KONG Siu Man, Elaine 江兆雯 | RE | 3 | 28 April 2005 | 19 July 2019 |
KONG Tin Kee 江天奇 | RE | 3 | 12 May 2005 | |
KWAN Chi Chuen 關智全 | RE | 3 | 02 March 2007 | 27 April 2018 |
KWAN Chi Chuen 關智全 | RE | 3 | 30 June 2005 | 07 June 2006 |
KWAN Ho Hang, Stephen 關浩恆 | RE | 3 | 23 March 2006 | 26 July 2006 |
KWAN Shi Yuen 關士元 | RE | 3 | 19 August 2004 | 12 September 2005 |
KWAN Sum Yu 關心宇 | RE | 3 | 19 September 2007 | 31 December 2018 |
KWOK Ching Oi, San 郭靜愛 | RE | 3 | 26 January 2005 | 27 April 2005 |
KWOK I Fung 郭貽豐 | RE | 3 | 30 August 2012 | 30 September 2022 |
KWOK Ka Lok 郭家樂 | RO | 3 | 31 May 2022 | |
KWOK Ka Lok 郭家樂 | RE | 3 | 17 November 2021 | 31 May 2022 |
KWOK Ka Lok 郭家樂 | RO | 3 | 10 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 |
KWOK Ka Lok 郭家樂 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 10 February 2021 |
KWOK Ka Nam 郭加南 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
KWOK Lai Kuen, Cary 郭麗娟 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 16 March 2004 |
KWOK Ming Chak, Barry 郭明澤 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 June 2004 |
KWOK Pak Chung 郭柏聰 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 23 November 2022 |
KWOK Wai Hung 郭偉雄 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
KWONG Ben Man Yip 鄺敏業 | RE | 3 | 09 July 2021 | 23 December 2021 |
LAI Chi Shing 黎志成 | RE | 3 | 26 August 2013 | 01 October 2014 |
LAI Ching Hung 黎正洪 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 October 2017 |
LAI Lai Nga 賴麗雅 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 19 October 2007 |
LAI Wai Chun 賴惠珍 | RE | 3 | 06 December 2012 | 09 April 2013 |
LAM Chi Keung, Chris 林志強 | RE | 3 | 26 April 2022 | |
LAM Chi Keung, Chris 林志強 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 December 2009 |
LAM Chi Ming, Gordon 林志明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 August 2018 |
LAM Chi Yuet 林智乙 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2014 |
LAM Chun Hung 林振洪 | RE | 3 | 18 January 2006 | 01 July 2017 |
LAM Hing Fai 林慶輝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 July 2014 |
LAM Hoi To 林凱濤 | RE | 3 | 25 April 2006 | 06 May 2006 |
LAM Hon Kin 林漢堅 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 September 2017 |
LAM Hung Tin George 林鴻天 | RE | 3 | 03 November 2015 | 12 November 2017 |
LAM Kong Cheong 林港昌 | RE | 3 | 27 February 2014 | 19 September 2015 |
LAM Lee Kuen 林莉娟 | RE | 3 | 07 August 2015 | 01 September 2017 |
LAM Ming Chun 林明俊 | RE | 3 | 18 May 2015 | 19 August 2017 |
LAM Shu Kwong 林樹光 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2015 |
LAM Siu Hong 林紹康 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 November 2019 |
LAM Suet Fun 林雪芬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 May 2012 |
LAM Suet Ying 林雪瑩 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
LAM Tin Hang, Sammy 林天行 | RE | 3 | 08 January 2016 | 15 August 2021 |
LAM Tin Hang, Sammy 林天行 | RE | 3 | 11 April 2005 | 19 August 2014 |
LAM Tsz Cheung, Franco 林子祥 | RE | 3 | 10 November 2003 | 31 August 2006 |
LAM Tsz Kan 林子勤 | RE | 3 | 13 September 2004 | 08 January 2007 |
LAM Wai Chun 林偉俊 | RE | 3 | 28 November 2007 | 26 March 2021 |
LAM Wai Kit 林偉傑 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 October 2006 |
LAM Wai Kit 林偉傑 | RE | 3 | 28 March 2007 | 25 November 2013 |
LAM Wing Chit 林永哲 | RE | 3 | 03 June 2008 | 30 December 2011 |
LAM Yu | RE | 3 | 27 January 2004 | |
LAM Yun Tung 林潤東 | RE | 3 | 28 November 2007 | 30 November 2007 |
LAU Chi Ho 劉志豪 | RE | 3 | 29 May 2012 | 06 August 2012 |
LAU Chun Sang 劉俊生 | RE | 3 | 13 February 2008 | 30 December 2011 |
LAU Hon Keung 劉漢強 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 December 2010 |
LAU Kin Keung 劉建強 | RE | 3 | 29 May 2013 | 01 April 2014 |
LAU Sai Wing 劉世榮 | RE | 3 | 10 May 2013 | 20 July 2021 |
LAU Tat On 劉達安 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 April 2007 |
LAU Woon Wan, Florence 劉換雲 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 February 2018 |
LAW Ka Lun 羅家麟 | RE | 3 | 24 September 2007 | 30 December 2010 |
LAW Kwai Kei, Jack 羅桂基 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 January 2007 |
LAW Pik Lin 羅碧蓮 | RE | 3 | 20 April 2009 | 05 October 2009 |
LAW Siu Wing 羅兆榮 | RE | 3 | 28 January 2008 | 02 November 2010 |
LAW Tak Shing 羅德成 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 October 2018 |
LAW Wing Ming 羅永明 | RE | 3 | 04 July 2008 | 20 January 2009 |
LEE Chen Min 李增民 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 10 July 2013 |
LEE Chi Cheung 李志祥 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 October 2015 |
LEE Chi Wang 李志宏 | RE | 3 | 05 April 2013 | 25 July 2017 |
LEE Ho Yin 李皓然 | RE | 3 | 21 December 2005 | 11 June 2020 |
LEE Hon Cheung 李漢祥 | RE | 3 | 25 April 2006 | 01 July 2013 |
LEE Hung Kong 李鴻江 | RE | 3 | 16 May 2014 | 07 November 2019 |
LEE Ming To 李銘濤 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
LEE Ngai Kan 李毅勤 | RE | 3 | 02 January 2004 | 03 November 2005 |
LEE Ngo Chung 李傲翀 | RE | 3 | 16 November 2011 | 27 May 2014 |
LEE Pak Fuk 李伯福 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 October 2015 |
LEE Siu Ying 李笑英 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 10 July 2003 |
LEE Wai Fun 李慧芬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 18 November 2004 |
LEE Wing Chung 李永忠 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 August 2022 |
LEE Wing Ho 李永豪 | RE | 3 | 06 March 2007 | 31 August 2007 |
LEE Wing Kin 李永健 | RE | 3 | 30 May 2012 | 18 May 2018 |
LEE Wing Lun, Alan 李永麟 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 March 2023 |
LEI Ho Chun 李浩俊 | RO | 3 | 06 February 2023 | |
LEI Ho Chun 李浩俊 | RE | 3 | 27 July 2022 | 06 February 2023 |
LEONG Chi Fung 梁智鋒 | RE | 3 | 23 January 2006 | 30 April 2007 |
LEUNG CHI YIN 梁智賢 | RE | 3 | 24 May 2024 | |
LEUNG Chi Wai 梁志偉 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2015 |
LEUNG Chun Hei, Matthias 梁俊希 | RE | 3 | 24 July 2009 | 11 November 2009 |
LEUNG Chun Wing 梁振榮 | RE | 3 | 03 March 2014 | 06 April 2018 |
LEUNG Chung Chi 梁頌慈 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 08 October 2010 |
LEUNG Hing Keung, Alexander 梁慶強 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 September 2005 |
LEUNG Hok Tsan 梁學贊 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 November 2006 |
LEUNG Ka Ho 梁家豪 | RE | 3 | 09 March 2012 | 08 August 2013 |
LEUNG Ka Kee 梁家祺 | RE | 3 | 09 May 2011 | 23 December 2021 |
LEUNG Ka Lok 梁嘉樂 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 16 August 2003 |
LEUNG Kin Chung 梁健忠 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2018 |
LEUNG Kin Sing 梁建成 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 June 2018 |
LEUNG Kwok On 梁國安 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 21 January 2020 |
LEUNG Lap Pui 梁立培 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 November 2021 |
LEUNG Lilian 梁懋琳 | RE | 3 | 23 August 2010 | 21 January 2020 |
LEUNG Shook Ying 梁淑英 | RE | 3 | 20 November 2009 | 31 August 2019 |
LEUNG Siu Kei Keith 梁紹基 | RE | 3 | 03 September 2008 | 31 December 2010 |
LEUNG Tak Ming 梁德明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 September 2017 |
LEUNG Tik Wai 梁狄偉 | RE | 3 | 16 March 2009 | 24 March 2015 |
LEUNG Tung Shing 梁東成 | RE | 3 | 26 June 2006 | 04 January 2017 |
LEUNG Wai Chi 梁蕙姿 | RE | 3 | 24 September 2014 | 06 January 2015 |
LEUNG Wai Kit 梁偉傑 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 March 2007 |
LEUNG Wai Kuen 梁偉權 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2013 |
LEUNG Wai Man, Jackie 梁偉民 | RE | 3 | 09 September 2005 | 25 October 2012 |
LEUNG Wai Man, Jackie 梁偉民 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 July 2003 |
LEUNG Wai Ming 梁衛明 | RE | 3 | 14 May 2007 | 28 April 2023 |
LEUNG Wing Chuen 梁永全 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 28 April 2017 |
LEUNG Wing Kin 梁永健 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 July 2014 |
LI Chi Wai 李志偉 | RE | 3 | 27 June 2007 | 31 March 2011 |
LI Hiu Tung 李曉東 | RE | 3 | 22 June 2005 | 15 September 2006 |
LI Kam Fong, Vivian 利錦芳 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 13 January 2022 |
LI Lok Wah 李樂華 | RE | 3 | 02 January 2004 | 02 March 2018 |
LI Suk Yee 李淑儀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 March 2012 |
LI Tsang Yim 李增艷 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 19 July 2004 |
LI Wai Ling 李偉陵 | RE | 3 | 13 June 2008 | 30 November 2019 |
LIT Yuk Ping 列玉萍 | RE | 3 | 12 March 2008 | 07 November 2015 |
LIU Chi Chung, Rayo 廖自中 | RE | 3 | 02 April 2007 | |
LIU Richard | RE | 3 | 24 March 2006 | 31 January 2008 |
LIU Yuen Pang 廖遠鵬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 October 2015 |
LO Chi Yat 盧智逸 | RE | 3 | 14 August 2014 | 19 September 2023 |
LO Ka Yan 盧嘉欣 | RE | 3 | 04 December 2008 | 25 June 2011 |
LO Kar Yiu 羅家耀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 24 September 2014 |
LO Ting Sit 盧霆燮 | RE | 3 | 26 February 2010 | 09 January 2012 |
LO Wei Man 羅偉文 | RE | 3 | 12 March 2008 | 20 July 2017 |
LOK Ka Chun 駱家俊 | RE | 3 | 10 September 2010 | 05 March 2016 |
LOK Tsz Hong 駱子康 | RE | 3 | 30 June 2008 | 27 April 2009 |
LUI Yiu Wah, Eric 雷耀華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 21 June 2019 |
LUI Yuen Man 呂苑雯 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 September 2004 |
LUK Kam Shan 陸錦珊 | RE | 3 | 30 June 2005 | 12 September 2005 |
LUK Wai Man 陸衛民 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 12 June 2009 |
MA Bing Shun 馬炳舜 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 08 June 2018 |
MA Kim Fai 馬劍輝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 June 2018 |
MA King Lun 馬敬倫 | RE | 3 | 05 October 2010 | 01 July 2011 |
MA Man Lam 馬文林 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 14 July 2020 |
MAK Ching Yan 麥靖欣 | RE | 3 | 17 July 2014 | 04 January 2018 |
MAK Chun Fai 麥振輝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 July 2010 |
MAK Tung Pui 麥棟培 | RE | 3 | 22 May 2014 | 20 February 2016 |
MOK Ho Yuen 莫浩源 | RE | 3 | 28 September 2010 | 22 March 2014 |
MOK Hung Wa, James 莫孔華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 14 May 2016 |
NG Chi Kong 吳志剛 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
NG Chung Ming 吳宗明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 July 2017 |
NG Emily Hoi Jiu 吳凱堯 | RE | 3 | 18 November 2016 | 29 August 2018 |
NG Fan Pang 吳奮鵬 | RE | 3 | 23 February 2011 | 06 December 2016 |
NG Fan Pang 吳奮鵬 | RE | 3 | 12 April 2005 | 31 January 2008 |
NG Hei Pak 吳希珀 | RE | 3 | 19 August 2004 | 12 September 2005 |
NG Hing Cheung 伍慶祥 | RE | 3 | 12 March 2010 | 15 June 2018 |
NG Hing Cheung 伍慶祥 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 14 September 2008 |
NG Ka Lun 吳嘉麟 | RE | 3 | 25 April 2008 | 04 February 2014 |
NG Ka Lun 吳嘉麟 | RE | 3 | 06 April 2005 | 27 July 2005 |
NG Ka Po 吳家寶 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 October 2018 |
NG Kin Sing 吳健星 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 April 2017 |
NG Kong 吳綱 | RE | 3 | 21 September 2004 | 01 January 2013 |
NG Kwai Ying, Ada 吳桂英 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 04 February 2010 |
NG Kwan Wing 吳君榮 | RE | 3 | 07 March 2007 | 31 March 2014 |
NG Kwok Chung 伍國誦 | RE | 3 | 03 March 2014 | 29 March 2017 |
NG Kwok Leung 吳國良 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 27 February 2006 |
NG Lai Fong, Ivy 吳麗芳 | RE | 3 | 15 February 2005 | 22 April 2006 |
NG Pak Suen, George 伍伯旋 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 January 2007 |
NG Poon Tak 吳潘德 | RE | 3 | 07 October 2004 | 29 November 2019 |
NG Shui Kan 吳萃勤 | RE | 3 | 12 February 2005 | 04 October 2012 |
NG Siu Kin 伍少堅 | RE | 3 | 18 October 2005 | 18 November 2011 |
NG Tak Pan 吳德濱 | RE | 3 | 06 June 2007 | 01 October 2007 |
NGAI Chi Chung 魏志忠 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 11 May 2013 |
NGAI Hoi Chun 魏開俊 | RE | 3 | 30 July 2004 | 10 February 2007 |
NGAN Kong Wai 顏光偉 | RE | 3 | 30 April 2004 | 06 October 2015 |
PANG Lok 彭樂 | RE | 3 | 16 April 2009 | 30 April 2010 |
POON Chi Hou 潘智濠 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 October 2015 |
POON Pong Shing 潘榜成 | RE | 3 | 06 February 2006 | 13 November 2006 |
POON Wai Keung 潘偉強 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 September 2005 |
PUN Hang Sang 潘恆燊 | RE | 3 | 25 March 2009 | 22 February 2016 |
SHAM Ip Tak 沈葉德 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 July 2012 |
SHEK Hoi Chun Brian 石海春 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 September 2005 |
SHIA Wing Shan 謝詠珊 | RE | 3 | 27 August 2007 | 07 November 2015 |
SHUM Cho Pong 沈曹邦 | RE | 3 | 05 December 2013 | 01 November 2016 |
SHUM Sai Chit 沈世捷 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 December 2003 |
SIAM Kai Sin 岑繼善 | RE | 3 | 04 August 2004 | 09 May 2010 |
SIK Kin Keung 薛健強 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 November 2003 |
SIN Siu Kay 冼少姬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2015 |
SIT Yuk Cheung 薛玉象 | RE | 3 | 11 December 2007 | 30 December 2009 |
SIU Cheuk Hung, Michael 蕭卓雄 | RE | 3 | 26 March 2008 | 02 November 2015 |
SIU Yik Chong 蕭亦創 | RE | 3 | 23 November 2005 | 22 December 2019 |
SIU Yim Wah 蕭炎華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 January 2009 |
SO Chiu Cheong, Steven 蘇炤昌 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 January 2010 |
SO Wai Hong 蘇偉康 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 16 November 2015 |
SZE Man Chuen 施汶佑 | RE | 3 | 20 March 2013 | 15 October 2017 |
TAI On Ting 戴安廷 | RE | 3 | 13 August 2007 | 09 November 2007 |
TAM Chun Sing, Nelson 譚震聲 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 October 2003 |
TAM Chung Kwong 談松光 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 18 November 2004 |
TAM Hoi Leung 譚海良 | RE | 3 | 01 February 2017 | 22 April 2022 |
TAM Hoi Leung 譚海良 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
TAM Wing Shun 譚永舜 | RE | 3 | 23 May 2011 | 28 February 2015 |
TANG Hiu Kit 鄧曉傑 | RE | 3 | 23 October 2007 | 31 January 2009 |
TANG Kam Wing 鄧錦榮 | RE | 3 | 18 March 2013 | 15 June 2015 |
TANG Loi Sik 鄧來息 | RE | 3 | 26 August 2015 | 03 April 2017 |
TING Chi Wai 丁志偉 | RE | 3 | 17 December 2008 | 22 April 2022 |
TO Hang Sang 杜衡生 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 June 2009 |
TO Suet Wai, Joey 杜雪慧 | RE | 3 | 18 March 2008 | 14 January 2018 |
TO Suet Wai, Joey 杜雪慧 | RE | 3 | 20 March 2006 | 29 January 2007 |
TO Suet Wai, Joey 杜雪慧 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 November 2005 |
TO Wai Yin 杜偉賢 | RE | 3 | 13 April 2004 | 04 May 2022 |
TONG Chi Hung 唐志雄 | RE | 3 | 27 August 2012 | 05 February 2014 |
TONG Hin Jo 湯顯祖 | RE | 3 | 21 August 2008 | 23 April 2014 |
TONG Hin Yip 湯顯業 | RE | 3 | 21 August 2008 | 31 January 2009 |
TONG Yiu Hei, Michael 湯曜禧 | RE | 3 | 25 April 2006 | 08 September 2011 |
TONG Yu On 唐宇安 | RE | 3 | 16 February 2007 | 01 May 2014 |
TSAI Lei Chi 蔡梨枝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 October 2016 |
TSANG Fai Kit 曾暉傑 | RE | 3 | 13 August 2008 | 10 September 2010 |
TSANG Hin Yi, Hubert 曾憲彝 | RE | 3 | 21 November 2008 | 30 December 2011 |
TSANG Ka Man 曾家文 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 September 2005 |
TSANG Kun Seong 曾冠尚 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 28 May 2007 |
TSANG Lung Keung, Alexis 曾瓏嵹 | RE | 3 | 26 June 2006 | 01 June 2016 |
TSANG Wai Hung 曾偉雄 | RE | 3 | 13 April 2004 | 30 August 2006 |
TSE Chuen Ho 謝轉好 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
TSE Kai Sang 謝繼生 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2018 |
TSE Kit Wah 謝傑華 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 August 2014 |
TSE Pak Cheong 謝伯昌 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 11 June 2020 |
TSE Pak Yeung 謝柏揚 | RE | 3 | 02 April 2013 | 04 April 2014 |
TSE Pak Yeung 謝柏揚 | RE | 3 | 14 August 2012 | 31 August 2012 |
TSE Pak Yeung 謝柏揚 | RE | 3 | 12 January 2009 | 31 December 2009 |
TSE Shing Hei, Alex 謝承熹 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 January 2024 |
TSE Wai Yin 謝偉賢 | RE | 3 | 21 December 2005 | 15 February 2011 |
TSOI Siu Ho 蔡少豪 | RE | 3 | 02 February 2005 | 01 May 2006 |
TSUI Che Sang 徐致生 | RE | 3 | 29 July 2010 | 03 October 2015 |
TSUI Che Sang 徐致生 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 January 2010 |
TSUI Pui Ming, Teresa 徐珮明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 22 April 2017 |
TUNG Pui Wan 董培雲 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 January 2006 |
WAN Kwok Leung 溫國良 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
WANG Po Yuk 王寶玉 | RE | 3 | 05 October 2021 | 25 May 2023 |
WONG Chi Chiu, Derrick 黃志超 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 12 August 2003 |
WONG Chi Fai 黃志輝 | RO | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 August 2003 |
WONG Chin Pang 黃展鵬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 21 May 2018 |
WONG Chor Kei 黃楚淇 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
WONG Chun Wing 王俊頴 | RE | 3 | 17 July 2013 | 17 October 2014 |
WONG Fuk Kin 黃福建 | RE | 3 | 29 June 2006 | 30 June 2009 |
WONG Fung Yan 黃鳳欣 | RE | 3 | 14 April 2022 | |
WONG Hang Wai 王恒威 | RE | 3 | 21 January 2013 | 15 October 2017 |
WONG Ka Kit 黃嘉傑 | RE | 3 | 12 March 2014 | 02 March 2015 |
WONG Ka Man, Carmen 黃嘉敏 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 17 August 2018 |
WONG Ka Yiu, Franky 黃家耀 | RO | 3 | 12 September 2011 | 03 April 2024 |
WONG Ka Yiu, Franky 黃家耀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 12 September 2011 |
WONG Kin Chun 黃健俊 | RE | 3 | 05 November 2013 | 25 March 2014 |
WONG Kin Chun 黃健俊 | RE | 3 | 18 June 2008 | 01 August 2013 |
WONG Kin Wing 王建榮 | RE | 3 | 22 July 2009 | 16 March 2013 |
WONG Kin Wing 王建榮 | RE | 3 | 02 January 2004 | 11 November 2004 |
WONG Kwai Wah 黃貴華 | RE | 3 | 08 April 2009 | 19 June 2009 |
WONG Kwai Wing 黃貴榮 | RE | 3 | 19 May 2008 | 30 December 2008 |
WONG Lap Chun 王立俊 | RE | 3 | 14 September 2011 | 08 August 2015 |
WONG Lap Kei 王立基 | RE | 3 | 26 March 2008 | 21 January 2013 |
WONG Lee Man 黃莉敏 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 12 May 2015 |
WONG Lung Shing 王龍成 | RE | 3 | 16 November 2012 | 15 October 2017 |
WONG Man Kit 黃文傑 | RE | 3 | 28 December 2004 | 16 April 2007 |
WONG Man Yin 黃敏然 | RE | 3 | 10 November 2009 | 12 August 2010 |
WONG Mau Shing, Saxon 黃茂盛 | RE | 3 | 02 September 2021 | |
WONG Mau Shing, Saxon 黃茂盛 | RO | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 August 2021 |
WONG Michael Sai Khit 王世傑 | RE | 3 | 14 April 2009 | 13 December 2010 |
WONG Nga Sze 黃雅詩 | RE | 3 | 19 June 2009 | 01 July 2017 |
WONG Nim Chi 王念慈 | RE | 3 | 02 December 2009 | 18 June 2012 |
WONG On Na, Anna 王安娜 | RE | 3 | 21 December 2005 | 20 April 2017 |
WONG Pan Pan 王彬彬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2003 |
WONG Pok Man 黃博文 | RE | 3 | 03 March 2014 | 27 August 2016 |
WONG Pui Shan 黃佩珊 | RE | 3 | 12 March 2015 | 28 July 2015 |
WONG Sau Lee 王綉梨 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 March 2015 |
WONG Shek Cheung 黃石昌 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 11 May 2009 |
WONG Shek Kwong, Joel 黃錫光 | RE | 3 | 31 May 2007 | 22 April 2009 |
WONG Shing Cheong 王勝祥 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 23 March 2004 |
WONG Sing Lung 王勝龍 | RE | 3 | 12 January 2015 | 08 August 2016 |
WONG Siu Laam 黃少嵐 | RE | 3 | 23 May 2011 | 31 March 2014 |
WONG Siu Man 王紹文 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
WONG Siu Yuk 黃笑玉 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 June 2018 |
WONG Sun Lee, Stanley 王新利 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
WONG Tik Kee 黃迪琪 | RE | 3 | 29 September 2006 | |
WONG Tung Ming 黃東明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 10 July 2003 |
WONG Wai Chee 黃瑋芝 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
WONG Wai Cheong 黃偉昌 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 04 June 2018 |
WONG Wai Ting 王慧婷 | RE | 3 | 28 June 2013 | 16 October 2013 |
WONG Wing Kin, Ricky 黃永健 | RE | 3 | 14 September 2009 | 31 October 2018 |
WONG Yau Nam 黃友南 | RO | 3 | 27 August 2010 | 17 April 2017 |
WONG Yau Nam 黃友南 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 27 August 2010 |
WONG Ying Ki 黃英琦 | RE | 3 | 23 November 2012 | 01 May 2013 |
WONG Ying Kin 黃英健 | RE | 3 | 28 December 2004 | 31 October 2007 |
WOO Yuk Fu 胡育富 | RO | 3 | 27 March 2023 | |
WOO Yuk Fu 胡育富 | RE | 3 | 04 November 2005 | 27 March 2023 |
WU Chung Yeung 胡仲陽 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | |
WU Ka Yin 胡嘉賢 | RE | 3 | 19 August 2004 | 26 September 2006 |
WU Ka Yin 胡嘉賢 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 October 2003 |
WU Kai Ming, Dionysus 胡啟明 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 11 February 2012 |
WU Ping Kong 鄔秉綱 | RE | 3 | 05 June 2009 | 24 August 2010 |
WU Shuk Ching, Kittie 胡淑貞 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2014 |
WU Wei Jia 吳尉佳 | RE | 3 | 13 August 2007 | 12 February 2008 |
YANG Wei 楊尉 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 30 December 2011 |
YAU Ka Chi 邱家智 | RE | 3 | 30 May 2005 | 31 March 2007 |
YAU Ka Wing 邱家榮 | RE | 3 | 20 November 2020 | |
YAU Yiu Tung 丘耀東 | RE | 3 | 12 December 2006 | 08 March 2013 |
YEUNG Chi Kin 楊志健 | RE | 3 | 11 March 2015 | 06 February 2016 |
YEUNG Ka Man, Carmen 楊嘉敏 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 29 August 2007 |
YEUNG Kin Wing, Kent 楊建榮 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 22 August 2005 |
YEUNG Mei Fung 楊美鳳 | RE | 3 | 16 December 2019 | |
YEUNG Mei Fung 楊美鳳 | RE | 3 | 13 August 2018 | 19 July 2019 |
YEUNG Mei Fung 楊美鳳 | RE | 3 | 13 April 2010 | 26 February 2018 |
YEUNG Mei Fung 楊美鳳 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 04 February 2010 |
YEUNG Wai Kin 楊煒堅 | RE | 3 | 19 June 2008 | 16 May 2011 |
YEUNG Wai Yin 楊偉賢 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 December 2014 |
YEUNG Ying Keung 楊應強 | RE | 3 | 13 June 2008 | 31 August 2009 |
YIM Pak Yiu 嚴栢曜 | RE | 3 | 02 August 2021 | |
YIM Wai Leung 嚴煒亮 | RE | 3 | 08 February 2023 | 21 September 2023 |
YIM Wai Leung 嚴煒亮 | RO | 3 | 25 October 2016 | 08 February 2023 |
YIM Wai Leung 嚴煒亮 | RO | 3 | 09 September 2011 | 31 December 2013 |
YIM Wai Leung 嚴煒亮 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 09 September 2011 |
YIP Chi Hin 葉志顯 | RE | 3 | 20 July 2005 | |
YIP Wai Hong 葉偉康 | RE | 3 | 12 April 2005 | 19 August 2006 |
YIP Wing Tim 葉永添 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 May 2018 |
YIP Wing Yan 葉穎恩 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 06 April 2018 |
YIP Yuen Yee, Simone 葉苑儀 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 October 2018 |
YU Hung Fei 余鴻飛 | RE | 3 | 21 October 2005 | 09 October 2014 |
YU Ka Wai 余家偉 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 15 October 2004 |
YU Tak Ki, Amelia 余得祈 | RE | 3 | 20 May 2013 | 01 April 2017 |
YU Tak Wai, Kelvin 余德偉 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 20 March 2006 |
YU Wai Shing 余偉成 | RE | 3 | 26 June 2006 | 13 October 2007 |
YUEN King Pun 袁敬彬 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 18 January 2019 |
YUEN Ying Ho 袁英豪 | RE | 3 | 27 August 2008 | 13 December 2013 |
YUEN Ying Ho 袁英豪 | RE | 3 | 04 August 2004 | 19 August 2004 |
YUEN Ying Ho 袁英豪 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 31 July 2003 |
YUNG Wai Kwun 容惠均 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 01 June 2016 |
YUNG Yu Shing 容宇晟 | RE | 3 | 29 June 2009 | 01 October 2016 |