SFC Licences of YIP Yuen Yee, Simone 葉苑儀
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Emperor Securities Limited 英皇證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 31 March 2011 | 26 October 2018 |
Emperor Securities Limited 英皇證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 October 2008 | 01 November 2010 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 26 October 2018 |