SFC Licences of SIK Kin Keung 薛健強
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Zhongrong PT Securities Limited 中融平和證券有限公司 | RE | 3 | 10 September 2010 | 17 March 2012 |
Peace Town Forex Limited 平和外匯有限公司 | RE | 3 | 19 March 2004 | 21 August 2010 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 25 November 2003 |