SFC Licences of WONG Kin Chun 黃健俊
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 05 November 2013 | 25 March 2014 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 18 June 2008 | 01 August 2013 |
Hong Kong Forex Investment Limited 香港外匯投資有限公司 | RE | 3 | 01 April 2003 | 11 March 2008 |