SFC Licences of CHAN Kwok On, Carlson 陳國安
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bright Fund Management Limited 光明投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 12 November 2018 | 31 August 2023 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 November 2018 | |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 30 October 2018 | |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 14 August 2018 | |
JPMorgan Funds (Asia) Limited 摩根基金(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 October 2015 | 03 May 2018 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 19 April 2013 | 07 August 2015 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 19 April 2013 | 07 August 2015 |