SFC Licences of SHUM Kit Lan, Anita 沈潔蘭
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chariot Capital Management Limited | RO | 9 | 07 March 2014 | 01 June 2023 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RO | 9 | 13 July 2007 | 27 April 2013 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RE | 9 | 22 June 2005 | 13 July 2007 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RE | 9 | 12 June 2004 | 15 October 2004 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RO | 9 | 25 March 2004 | 12 June 2004 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 25 March 2004 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 21 May 2003 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 21 May 2003 |