SFC Licenceholders of Chariot Capital Management Limited
- florence@chariotcapital.com.hk
- Website
- No website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHEUNG Chun Hoi, Allan 張鎮海 | RO | 9 | 31 July 2017 | 01 June 2023 |
CHEUNG Chun Hoi, Allan 張鎮海 | RE | 9 | 20 May 2014 | 31 July 2017 |
CHEUNG Sze Mei, Florence 張斯美 | RO | 9 | 07 March 2014 | 01 June 2023 |
SHUM Kit Lan, Anita 沈潔蘭 | RO | 9 | 07 March 2014 | 01 June 2023 |