SFC Licences of LEE Wing Kin 李永健
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 30 May 2012 | 18 May 2018 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 30 May 2003 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 7 | 01 April 2003 | 30 May 2003 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 5 | 01 April 2003 | 30 May 2003 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 01 April 2003 | 30 May 2003 |