SFC Licences of CHUA Swee Ai, Susan 蔡素珊
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 07 July 2006 | 01 February 2007 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 01 February 2007 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 01 February 2007 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 05 March 2005 |