SFC Licenceholders of Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司
- compliance@platina.net
- Website
- www.accessfunds.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CAO Jiayi 曹佳怡 | RE | 9 | 29 October 2012 | 21 February 2014 |
CAO Jiayi 曹佳怡 | RE | 4 | 29 October 2012 | 21 February 2014 |
CHEN Jiajun 陳佳俊 | RE | 9 | 14 October 2016 | 09 October 2018 |
CHEN Jiajun 陳佳俊 | RE | 4 | 14 October 2016 | 09 October 2018 |
CHENG Li 程莉 | RE | 9 | 27 January 2014 | 21 May 2015 |
CHENG Li 程莉 | RE | 4 | 27 January 2014 | 21 May 2015 |
CHEUNG Tin Chun 張天駿 | RE | 9 | 26 January 2015 | 10 April 2015 |
CHEUNG Tin Chun 張天駿 | RE | 4 | 26 January 2015 | 10 April 2015 |
CHIN Julius Jiun 錢浚 | RE | 9 | 12 March 2015 | 22 May 2015 |
CHIN Julius Jiun 錢浚 | RE | 4 | 12 March 2015 | 22 May 2015 |
CHUA Swee Ai, Susan 蔡素珊 | RE | 5 | 07 July 2006 | 01 February 2007 |
CHUA Swee Ai, Susan 蔡素珊 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 01 February 2007 |
CHUA Swee Ai, Susan 蔡素珊 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 01 February 2007 |
CHUA Swee Ai, Susan 蔡素珊 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 05 March 2005 |
FONG Yu 方瑜 | RE | 9 | 14 September 2009 | 31 December 2009 |
FONG Yu 方瑜 | RE | 4 | 14 September 2009 | 31 December 2009 |
FONG Yu 方瑜 | RE | 5 | 14 September 2009 | 31 December 2009 |
HO Tse Chung, Billy 何子聰 | RO | 9 | 22 March 2005 | 09 March 2006 |
HO Tse Chung, Billy 何子聰 | RO | 5 | 22 March 2005 | 09 March 2006 |
HO Tse Chung, Billy 何子聰 | RO | 4 | 22 March 2005 | 09 March 2006 |
HO Tse Chung, Billy 何子聰 | RE | 9 | 20 May 2004 | 22 March 2005 |
HO Tse Chung, Billy 何子聰 | RE | 4 | 20 May 2004 | 22 March 2005 |
KOH Choy 郭才 | RE | 9 | 28 July 2006 | 28 February 2007 |
KOH Choy 郭才 | RE | 5 | 28 July 2006 | 28 February 2007 |
KOH Choy 郭才 | RE | 4 | 28 July 2006 | 28 February 2007 |
LAM Chi Keung 林智強 | RE | 9 | 21 April 2008 | 01 May 2009 |
LAM Chi Keung 林智強 | RE | 4 | 21 April 2008 | 01 May 2009 |
LAM Chi Keung 林智強 | RE | 5 | 21 April 2008 | 01 May 2009 |
LAM Chin Ming 林展明 | RE | 9 | 06 February 2007 | 14 June 2007 |
LAM Chin Ming 林展明 | RE | 5 | 06 February 2007 | 14 June 2007 |
LAM Chin Ming 林展明 | RE | 4 | 29 December 2006 | 14 June 2007 |
LAM Chun Hung, Cassidy 林振雄 | RE | 9 | 28 June 2007 | 06 August 2007 |
LAM Chun Hung, Cassidy 林振雄 | RE | 5 | 28 June 2007 | 06 August 2007 |
LAM Chun Hung, Cassidy 林振雄 | RE | 4 | 28 June 2007 | 06 August 2007 |
LAU Ho Man Jacky 劉灝民 | RE | 9 | 04 February 2021 | 13 January 2022 |
LAU Ho Man Jacky 劉灝民 | RE | 4 | 04 February 2021 | 13 January 2022 |
LEUNG Ho Nam 梁浩楠 | RE | 9 | 29 January 2016 | 19 February 2016 |
LEUNG Ho Nam 梁浩楠 | RE | 4 | 29 January 2016 | 19 February 2016 |
LEUNG Ka Wai, Billy 梁家威 | RE | 9 | 13 August 2007 | 17 September 2007 |
LEUNG Ka Wai, Billy 梁家威 | RE | 4 | 13 August 2007 | 17 September 2007 |
LEUNG Ka Wai, Billy 梁家威 | RE | 5 | 13 August 2007 | 17 September 2007 |
LIU Chee Ming 劉志敏 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 18 January 2005 |
LIU Chee Ming 劉志敏 | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | |
LIU Chee Ming 劉志敏 | RO | 5 | 01 April 2003 | |
LIU Chee Ming 劉志敏 | RO | 9 | 01 April 2003 | |
LIU Yilong 劉一龍 | RE | 9 | 23 January 2020 | 14 February 2020 |
LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮 | RO | 5 | 13 February 2019 | |
LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮 | RO | 9 | 01 December 2015 | |
LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮 | RO | 4 | 01 December 2015 | |
LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮 | RE | 5 | 02 September 2015 | 13 February 2019 |
LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮 | RE | 9 | 31 January 2012 | 01 December 2015 |
LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮 | RE | 4 | 31 January 2012 | 01 December 2015 |
LUI Wang Ho 雷宏灝 | RE | 5 | 30 May 2006 | 29 June 2006 |
LUI Wang Ho 雷宏灝 | RE | 4 | 30 May 2006 | 29 June 2006 |
LUI Wang Ho 雷宏灝 | RE | 9 | 30 May 2006 | 29 June 2006 |
MAHONY Terence Francis | RE | 9 | 28 May 2010 | 01 November 2011 |
MAHONY Terence Francis | RE | 4 | 28 May 2010 | 01 November 2011 |
MAHONY Terence Francis | RO | 9 | 25 November 2009 | 28 May 2010 |
MAHONY Terence Francis | RO | 4 | 25 November 2009 | 28 May 2010 |
NG Hoi Wang 吳海宏 | RE | 9 | 13 June 2007 | 10 July 2007 |
NG Hoi Wang 吳海宏 | RE | 5 | 13 June 2007 | 10 July 2007 |
NG Hoi Wang 吳海宏 | RE | 4 | 13 June 2007 | 10 July 2007 |
NG Yuen Ting 吳宛庭 | RE | 9 | 30 July 2007 | 31 July 2009 |
NG Yuen Ting 吳宛庭 | RE | 5 | 30 July 2007 | 31 July 2009 |
NG Yuen Ting 吳宛庭 | RE | 4 | 30 July 2007 | 31 July 2009 |
PAK Hung Kong 白鴻江 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 23 May 2003 |
PAK Hung Kong 白鴻江 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 23 May 2003 |
PAK Hung Kong 白鴻江 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 23 May 2003 |
SHENG Yiran 盛一然 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2011 | 16 March 2012 |
SHENG Yiran 盛一然 | RE | 9 | 01 February 2011 | 16 March 2012 |
TAM Yee Hang 譚綺蘅 | RE | 9 | 23 February 2010 | 03 September 2010 |
TAM Yee Hang 譚綺蘅 | RE | 4 | 23 February 2010 | 03 September 2010 |
TANG Davina Tak-wai 鄧德慧 | RE | 4 | 08 September 2003 | 10 December 2003 |
TANG Davina Tak-wai 鄧德慧 | RE | 9 | 10 July 2003 | 10 December 2003 |
THOMAS Robert Heriot Lindsay | RO | 5 | 23 December 2011 | |
THOMAS Robert Heriot Lindsay | RO | 5 | 14 June 2006 | 13 October 2009 |
THOMAS Robert Heriot Lindsay | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 18 October 2004 |
THOMAS Robert Heriot Lindsay | RO | 5 | 01 April 2003 | 18 October 2004 |
THOMAS Robert Heriot Lindsay | RO | 9 | 01 April 2003 | |
THOMAS Robert Heriot Lindsay | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | |
WAN Kenny 尹建銘 | RE | 9 | 17 February 2004 | 04 May 2004 |
WAN Kenny 尹建銘 | RE | 4 | 17 February 2004 | 04 May 2004 |
WANG Zheng 王征 | RE | 9 | 04 November 2019 | 15 July 2020 |
WONG Hoi Ting Janice 黃愷婷 | RE | 4 | 28 March 2011 | 28 May 2011 |
WONG Hoi Ting Janice 黃愷婷 | RE | 9 | 28 March 2011 | 28 May 2011 |
WONG Tsz Hung 黃梓熊 | RE | 4 | 14 January 2014 | 03 July 2015 |
WONG Tsz Hung 黃梓熊 | RE | 9 | 14 January 2014 | 03 July 2015 |
YIP Ho Yin 葉皓然 | RE | 9 | 23 April 2009 | 07 August 2009 |
YIP Ho Yin 葉皓然 | RE | 4 | 23 April 2009 | 07 August 2009 |
YIP Ho Yin 葉皓然 | RE | 5 | 23 April 2009 | 07 August 2009 |
YUEN Wai Chak, Wilfred 袁瑋澤 | RE | 9 | 13 October 2011 | 23 November 2012 |
YUEN Wai Chak, Wilfred 袁瑋澤 | RE | 4 | 13 October 2011 | 23 November 2012 |
ZHAN Lingli | RE | 5 | 24 December 2007 | 15 August 2008 |
ZHAN Lingli | RE | 9 | 24 December 2007 | 15 August 2008 |
ZHAN Lingli | RE | 4 | 24 December 2007 | 15 August 2008 |
ZHAO He 趙賀 | RE | 4 | 03 December 2012 | 09 January 2013 |
ZHAO He 趙賀 | RE | 9 | 03 December 2012 | 09 January 2013 |