SFC Licences of IP Yun Ping 葉潤屏
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Centaline Securities Limited 中原證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 February 2012 | |
Centaline Wealth Management Limited 中原資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 June 2010 | |
Centaline Wealth Management Limited 中原資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 22 February 2005 | |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 30 November 2004 | 07 February 2005 |
Principal Global Investors (Asia) Limited 信安環球投資(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 24 May 2004 |
Principal Global Investors (Asia) Limited 信安環球投資(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 24 May 2004 |
Principal Global Investors (Asia) Limited 信安環球投資(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 24 May 2004 |
Principal Global Investors (Asia) Limited 信安環球投資(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 24 May 2004 |