SFC Licences of CHEUNG Sze Mei, Florence 張斯美
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chariot Capital Management Limited | RO | 9 | 07 March 2014 | 01 June 2023 |
Koi Investment Partners International Limited | RO | 9 | 05 November 2010 | 01 November 2013 |
HT Capital Management Limited | RE | 9 | 03 October 2006 | 17 April 2009 |
Pacific Group Limited, The | RE | 9 | 29 April 2005 | 01 September 2006 |
Pacific Group Limited, The | RE | 4 | 28 January 2004 | 24 February 2005 |
Sun Hung Kai Research Limited 新鴻基資料研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 13 January 2004 |
Sun Hung Kai Research Limited 新鴻基資料研究有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 09 January 2004 |
Sun Hung Kai Research Limited 新鴻基資料研究有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 09 January 2004 |