SFC Licences of ZHANG Jian Bin 張劍斌
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 19 August 2021 | 31 May 2024 |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 19 August 2021 | 31 May 2024 |
HSBC Broking Securities (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 08 April 2015 | 20 July 2021 |
HSBC Broking Forex (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融外匯(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 25 March 2014 | 20 July 2021 |
HSBC Broking Securities (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 25 March 2014 | 20 July 2021 |
HSBC Broking Futures (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融期貨(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 25 March 2014 | 20 July 2021 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 3 | 05 August 2013 | 14 March 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 April 2013 | 14 March 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 April 2013 | 14 March 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 29 December 2006 | 07 February 2013 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 29 December 2006 | 07 February 2013 |