SFC Licences of TAN Edna Lorraine
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited | RE | 4 | 22 February 2017 | |
Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited | RO | 4 | 29 September 2015 | 22 February 2017 |
Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited | RE | 4 | 17 August 2015 | 29 September 2015 |
Standard & Poor's Investment Advisory Services (HK) Limited | RO | 4 | 21 September 2010 | 01 April 2014 |
Standard & Poor's, LLC | RO | 4 | 04 February 2005 | 31 October 2010 |
Standard & Poor's, LLC | RE | 4 | 29 April 2003 | 04 February 2005 |