SFC Licenceholders of Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited
- hksupport@morningstar.com
- Website
- No website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
ABEYGUNAWARDANA Shihan Chamila | RE | 4 | 22 January 2019 | |
BAKER Daniel Robert | RE | 4 | 18 February 2021 | |
BAKER Daniel Robert | RO | 4 | 16 September 2015 | 18 February 2021 |
BAKER Daniel Robert | RE | 4 | 17 November 2014 | 16 September 2015 |
BEAUDOIN Hunter Reece | RE | 4 | 23 September 2021 | |
BHAT Sundeep | RE | 4 | 26 November 2019 | 13 February 2023 |
BLOOMER Joel Robert | RO | 4 | 08 December 2014 | 09 October 2015 |
CAMPBELL Elizabeth Jingxi Peng | RE | 4 | 03 December 2018 | 13 April 2022 |
CHALK Nicholas Gyles Edward | RE | 4 | 11 March 2019 | 31 March 2020 |
CHAN Ching Yee 陳靖怡 | RE | 4 | 02 December 2020 | |
CHAN Wing Hei 陳永熙 | RO | 4 | 07 December 2015 | |
CHAN Wing Hei 陳永熙 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2014 | 07 December 2015 |
CHENG Chia-Lun 鄭家倫 | RE | 4 | 23 March 2016 | 23 March 2021 |
CHEUNG Hoi Ki 張凱騏 | RE | 4 | 11 August 2022 | 12 January 2024 |
CHEUNG Nicholas 張瀚升 | RO | 4 | 21 September 2016 | |
CHOW William Kong Meng 仇光明 | RE | 4 | 04 June 2020 | 31 January 2022 |
CHOY Tsun Kit, Jackie 蔡俊傑 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2014 | |
DANIELS Andrew Scott | RE | 4 | 03 December 2018 | 22 February 2021 |
DIETRICH Peter | RE | 4 | 17 August 2016 | 19 December 2018 |
FLORO Jeff Rey | RE | 4 | 11 December 2015 | 02 March 2018 |
FOONG Pooi Ken | RE | 4 | 14 November 2019 | 28 April 2021 |
GALLOWAY Christopher Andrew | RO | 4 | 08 May 2014 | 31 December 2016 |
GALLOWAY Christopher Andrew | RO | 9 | 08 May 2014 | 07 March 2016 |
GE Patrick Yuanning | RE | 4 | 05 June 2019 | 09 September 2022 |
GORHAM Philip Matthew | RO | 4 | 04 January 2021 | 31 July 2023 |
GORHAM Philip Matthew | RE | 4 | 10 November 2020 | 04 January 2021 |
GRABOW Adam Michael | RE | 4 | 12 February 2015 | 12 March 2021 |
GRABOW Adam Michael | RE | 9 | 12 February 2015 | 07 March 2016 |
HU Song | RE | 4 | 14 August 2015 | 20 June 2017 |
HUI Ka Wo 許家和 | RE | 4 | 02 August 2022 | |
ITO Kazunori | RE | 4 | 11 May 2016 | 20 June 2017 |
KAN Siu Chung 簡兆聰 | RE | 4 | 08 May 2023 | |
KENNAWAY Grant Lindsay | RO | 4 | 08 December 2014 | 31 December 2016 |
KUM Yan Ting 甘欣庭 | RE | 4 | 12 May 2014 | 27 June 2016 |
KUM Yan Ting 甘欣庭 | RE | 9 | 12 May 2014 | 02 March 2016 |
KUMAGAI Mari | RE | 4 | 17 February 2016 | 20 June 2017 |
LAIDLAW Mark | RE | 4 | 05 October 2015 | 26 March 2018 |
LEE Chok Wai | RO | 4 | 19 February 2024 | |
LEE Chok Wai | RE | 4 | 07 November 2019 | 19 February 2024 |
LEE Chok Wai | RE | 4 | 22 December 2015 | 16 March 2018 |
LEE Jay Shen | RE | 4 | 08 August 2018 | 20 August 2023 |
LEE Philip Thomas | RE | 4 | 01 February 2019 | 31 May 2023 |
LEE Yuk Yeung, Phelix 李旭暘 | RE | 4 | 25 October 2019 | |
LIANG Zhengwei 梁政瑋 | RE | 4 | 06 June 2019 | |
LO Samuel | RE | 4 | 24 January 2020 | |
NEL Jan Abraham | RE | 4 | 09 July 2018 | 06 September 2019 |
PANG Ho Chuen 彭浩銓 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2019 | 15 January 2021 |
PANG Yuk Hung | RE | 4 | 30 October 2019 | |
PUTATUNDA Rajarshi | RE | 4 | 04 September 2020 | |
QU Chenchen 屈辰晨 | RE | 4 | 21 June 2019 | 30 September 2023 |
SHARE Chung Man, Germaine 佘仲文 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2014 | |
SONG Xiao Wei 宋曉偉 | RE | 4 | 17 September 2015 | 20 June 2017 |
SU Ruzhe 蘇汝哲 | RE | 4 | 23 March 2018 | |
SUN Fei 孫飛 | RE | 4 | 23 February 2022 | |
SUN Jia 孫佳 | RE | 4 | 23 November 2021 | 02 March 2022 |
SUN Wen 孫雯 | RE | 4 | 13 October 2015 | 31 August 2017 |
TAM Yee Hang 譚綺蘅 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2014 | |
TAN Edna Lorraine | RE | 4 | 22 February 2017 | |
TAN Edna Lorraine | RO | 4 | 29 September 2015 | 22 February 2017 |
TAN Edna Lorraine | RE | 4 | 17 August 2015 | 29 September 2015 |
TAN Jiaping 譚嘉萍 | RE | 4 | 15 September 2015 | 20 June 2017 |
TAO Jin 陶瑾 | RO | 9 | 08 May 2014 | 29 February 2016 |
TAO Jin 陶瑾 | RO | 4 | 08 May 2014 | 29 February 2016 |
TSAI Ti-yun 蔡笛韻 | RE | 4 | 18 November 2019 | 18 March 2022 |
TSANG Ho Yin 曾浩賢 | RE | 4 | 30 August 2021 | |
VAZQUEZ NG Chau Po Teresa 吳秋寶 | RE | 4 | 17 June 2020 | 06 October 2023 |
WANG Chien-Kai 王健凯 | RE | 4 | 04 October 2021 | |
WEI Shanshan 韋珊珊 | RE | 4 | 26 August 2016 | 20 June 2017 |
WONG Chi Lok, Cedric 黃志樂 | RE | 4 | 07 December 2015 | 21 June 2019 |
WONG Chi Lok, Cedric 黃志樂 | RE | 9 | 07 December 2015 | 02 March 2016 |
WONG Sze Man 黃思敏 | RE | 4 | 21 January 2016 | 05 August 2016 |
WONG Sze Man 黃思敏 | RO | 4 | 05 August 2016 | 09 June 2017 |
WOO Stephanie Ka Wai 胡家瑋 | RE | 4 | 03 February 2017 | 06 November 2020 |
WU Michael Kai-tai 胡啟泰 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2014 | 14 December 2022 |
WU Yuening 吴粤宁 | RE | 4 | 30 August 2022 | |
XIE Yu 謝瑜 | RE | 4 | 07 September 2015 | 09 April 2020 |
YANG Shuchao 楊書超 | RE | 4 | 12 October 2023 | |
YEW Yeow Xin Don 尤孝鑫 | RE | 4 | 11 December 2015 | 12 July 2017 |
YI Jiaping 易佳平 | RE | 4 | 21 March 2016 | 17 March 2017 |
ZHANG Junfei 張峻菲 | RE | 4 | 01 September 2021 | |
ZHENG Yongcan | RE | 4 | 21 March 2016 | 14 March 2017 |
ZHONG Phillip Yun 鍾允 | RE | 4 | 06 March 2015 | 26 March 2021 |