SFC Licences of MAK Rocky Wanlong 麥雲龍
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
JPMorgan Funds (Asia) Limited 摩根基金(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 July 2005 | 17 February 2011 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 07 November 2003 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 7 | 01 April 2003 | 07 July 2003 |