SFC Licences of LEUNG Chuen Fai 梁泉輝
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RO | 4 | 23 January 2024 | |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RO | 1 | 14 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 14 August 2023 | |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 07 June 2023 | 14 August 2023 |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 June 2023 | 14 August 2023 |
VMS Securities Limited 鼎珮證券有限公司 | RO | 6 | 10 December 2015 | 31 March 2023 |
VMS Securities Limited 鼎珮證券有限公司 | RO | 1 | 10 December 2015 | 31 March 2023 |
VMS Securities Limited 鼎珮證券有限公司 | RO | 4 | 10 December 2015 | 01 September 2020 |
VMS Securities Limited 鼎珮證券有限公司 | RE | 6 | 23 September 2015 | 10 December 2015 |
VMS Securities Limited 鼎珮證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 23 September 2015 | 10 December 2015 |
VMS Securities Limited 鼎珮證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 September 2015 | 10 December 2015 |
Somerley Capital Limited 新百利融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 27 December 2013 | 31 August 2015 |
Somerley Capital Limited 新百利融資有限公司 | RO | 1 | 27 December 2013 | 31 August 2015 |
Shang International Finance Limited 尚融國際金融有限公司 | RO | 6 | 08 October 2009 | 15 April 2014 |
Shang International Finance Limited 尚融國際金融有限公司 | RO | 4 | 08 October 2009 | 15 April 2014 |
Shang International Finance Limited 尚融國際金融有限公司 | RO | 1 | 08 October 2009 | 15 April 2014 |
Shang International Finance Limited 尚融國際金融有限公司 | RE | 6 | 15 December 2003 | 08 October 2009 |
Shang International Finance Limited 尚融國際金融有限公司 | RE | 4 | 15 December 2003 | 08 October 2009 |
Shang International Finance Limited 尚融國際金融有限公司 | RE | 1 | 15 December 2003 | 08 October 2009 |