SFC Licences of LI Ching Ming, Alfred 李正鳴
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
SunAsia Investment Management Limited 德昇投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 March 2016 | 18 April 2017 |
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 18 August 2014 | 29 January 2016 |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 18 August 2014 | 29 January 2016 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 3 | 07 January 2014 | 24 July 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 07 January 2014 | 24 July 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 January 2014 | 24 July 2014 |
HSBC Broking Forex (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融外匯(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 17 June 2004 | 23 December 2013 |
HSBC Broking Securities (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 February 2004 | 23 December 2013 |
HSBC Broking Futures (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融期貨(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 February 2004 | 23 December 2013 |