SFC Licences of CHAN Lai Sha 陳麗莎
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Emperor Securities Limited 英皇證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 10 December 2009 | 01 November 2010 |
Emperor International Exchange (Hong Kong) Company Limited 英皇金融集團(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 30 April 2008 | 16 October 2013 |
Hong Kong Forex Investment Limited 香港外匯投資有限公司 | RE | 3 | 28 November 2005 | 03 March 2008 |