SFC Licences of LEE Pak Shing 李百成
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 01 June 2015 | 05 January 2021 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 June 2015 | 05 January 2021 |
China Everbright Forex & Futures (HK) Limited 中國光大外匯、期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 06 November 2007 | 24 June 2008 |
China Everbright Securities (HK) Limited 中國光大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 10 September 2007 | 24 June 2008 |
China Everbright Forex & Futures (HK) Limited 中國光大外匯、期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 December 2006 | 24 June 2008 |
China Everbright Securities (HK) Limited 中國光大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 12 December 2006 | 24 June 2008 |
CES Forex (HK) Limited 光證外匯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 21 September 2006 | 05 December 2006 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 24 February 2006 | 05 December 2006 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 24 February 2006 | 05 December 2006 |