SFC Licences of CHAN Chor Yan 陳楚欣
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 November 2020 | |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 12 November 2020 | |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 3 | 12 December 2006 | 30 October 2011 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 March 2006 | 17 October 2020 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 March 2006 | 17 October 2020 |