SFC Licences of LAM Chun Hung, Cassidy 林振雄
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
RE | 9 | 27 October 2010 | 22 March 2012 | |
RE | 4 | 27 October 2010 | 22 March 2012 | |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 28 June 2007 | 06 August 2007 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 28 June 2007 | 06 August 2007 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 28 June 2007 | 06 August 2007 |