SFC Licences of WONG Chi Lok, Cedric 黃志樂
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited | RE | 4 | 07 December 2015 | 21 June 2019 |
Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited | RE | 9 | 07 December 2015 | 02 March 2016 |
ETRADE Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 億創證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 29 August 2007 | 01 November 2010 |
ETRADE Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 億創證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 July 2007 | 01 November 2010 |
ETRADE Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 億創證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 05 July 2007 | 01 November 2010 |