SFC Licences of CHEVELEY Richard George Castelfranc
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 26 May 2021 | 28 May 2021 |
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 28 September 2020 | 28 September 2020 |
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 09 October 2019 | 11 October 2019 |
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 14 May 2019 | 17 May 2019 |
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 07 May 2018 | 11 May 2018 |
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 21 November 2016 | 25 November 2016 |
Ninety One Hong Kong Limited 晉達資產管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 17 March 2015 | 20 March 2015 |
Investec Asset Management Asia Limited 天達資產管理亞洲有限公司 | RE | 4 | 07 January 2008 | 19 January 2008 |