SFC Licences of FAN Ping Kin 范炳堅
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Emperor Wealth Management Limited 英皇財富管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 December 2009 | 15 July 2013 |
Emperor Securities Limited 英皇證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 December 2009 | 15 July 2013 |
Emperor Futures Limited 英皇期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 December 2009 | 27 April 2011 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 28 April 2008 | 08 October 2009 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 April 2008 | 08 October 2009 |