SFC Licences of KAWABE Takahiro
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Nomura Asset Management Hong Kong Limited 野村投資管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 19 January 2009 | 19 February 2009 |
Nomura Asset Management Hong Kong Limited 野村投資管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 24 July 2008 | 24 August 2008 |