SFC Licences of LUI Chi Hang 雷志恒
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 21 November 2016 | |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 November 2016 | |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 3 | 06 March 2013 | 19 January 2015 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 15 December 2010 | 06 January 2016 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 29 October 2008 | 06 January 2016 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 29 October 2008 | 10 November 2011 |