SFC Licences of CHOW Lai Sze 周麗斯
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
UOB Kay Hian Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 大華繼顯期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 December 2009 | 25 April 2013 |
UOB Kay Hian (Hong Kong) Limited 大華繼顯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 December 2009 | 25 April 2013 |
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 13 March 2009 | 28 August 2009 |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 January 2009 | 28 August 2009 |