SFC Licences of LIU Zhen Rong, Daryl 劉鎮榮
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 5 | 13 February 2019 | |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 9 | 01 December 2015 | |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 4 | 01 December 2015 | |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 02 September 2015 | 13 February 2019 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 31 January 2012 | 01 December 2015 |
Access Investment Management (H.K.) Limited 安信投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 31 January 2012 | 01 December 2015 |