SFC Licences of CHU Long Wai 朱朗維
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Shenwan Hongyuan Futures (H.K.) Limited 申萬宏源期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 07 March 2014 | 24 May 2014 |
Shenwan Hongyuan Securities (H.K.) Limited 申萬宏源證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 March 2014 | 24 May 2014 |
Fulbright Futures Limited 富昌期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 April 2012 | 04 January 2014 |
Fulbright Securities Limited 富昌證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 April 2012 | 04 January 2014 |
UOB Kay Hian Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 大華繼顯期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 27 July 2011 | 12 January 2012 |
UOB Kay Hian (Hong Kong) Limited 大華繼顯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 27 July 2011 | 12 January 2012 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 08 March 2010 | 20 July 2011 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 08 March 2010 | 20 July 2011 |