SFC Licences of YAU Man Li 邱敏莉
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Frontier Capital Management Limited 方達資本管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 04 November 2016 | 14 November 2016 |
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 18 August 2014 | 18 May 2016 |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 18 August 2014 | 18 May 2016 |
HSBC Broking Forex (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融外匯(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 08 May 2014 | 05 July 2014 |
HSBC Broking Securities (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 February 2014 | 05 July 2014 |
HSBC Broking Futures (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融期貨(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 05 February 2014 | 05 July 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 24 August 2010 | 01 January 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 19 May 2010 | 01 January 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 19 May 2010 | 10 November 2011 |