SFC Licences of LEE Janice Yuan Rong 李元容
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Jones Lang LaSalle Real Estate Advisory Limited 仲量聯行房地產顧問有限公司 | RE | 4 | 16 May 2022 | 30 April 2024 |
Jones Lang LaSalle Real Estate Advisory Limited 仲量聯行房地產顧問有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 May 2022 | 30 April 2024 |
Tianli Financial Limited 天利金融有限公司 | RE | 9 | 14 October 2020 | 28 February 2022 |
Tianli Financial Limited 天利金融有限公司 | RE | 4 | 14 October 2020 | 28 February 2022 |