SFC Licenceholders of Tianli Financial Limited 天利金融有限公司
- enquiry@tlhg.com.hk
- Website
- http://www.tlhg.com.hk/
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
BAI Yanan 白雅男 | RE | 9 | 22 August 2019 | 23 July 2021 |
BAI Yanan 白雅男 | RE | 4 | 22 August 2019 | 23 July 2021 |
CHAN CHUN YAN 陳晉殷 | RE | 9 | 25 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 |
CHAN CHUN YAN 陳晉殷 | RE | 4 | 25 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 |
CHEN Ying 陳瀛 | RE | 9 | 23 October 2019 | |
CHEN Ying 陳瀛 | RE | 4 | 23 October 2019 | |
CHEUNG Ngai Wa 張藝華 | RE | 9 | 02 September 2020 | 25 May 2024 |
CHEUNG Ngai Wa 張藝華 | RE | 4 | 02 September 2020 | 25 May 2024 |
CHOW Kin Fei 周建飛 | RE | 9 | 10 October 2018 | 05 July 2019 |
CHOW Kin Fei 周建飛 | RE | 4 | 10 October 2018 | 05 July 2019 |
CHUN Ka Lee Carrie | RE | 9 | 28 May 2019 | 16 August 2019 |
CHUN Ka Lee Carrie | RE | 4 | 28 May 2019 | 16 August 2019 |
DENG Yuan 鄧园 | RE | 4 | 15 August 2017 | 07 April 2018 |
DENG Yuan 鄧园 | RE | 9 | 15 August 2017 | 07 April 2018 |
DOU Yik Siu 屠益兆 | RE | 9 | 28 November 2016 | 21 August 2018 |
DOU Yik Siu 屠益兆 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2016 | 21 August 2018 |
FU Pingcheng 付平成 | RE | 9 | 10 May 2017 | 08 May 2018 |
FU Pingcheng 付平成 | RE | 4 | 04 January 2017 | 08 May 2018 |
HO Cheuk Hay 何卓羲 | RE | 9 | 03 January 2019 | 30 August 2019 |
HO Cheuk Hay 何卓羲 | RE | 4 | 03 January 2019 | 30 August 2019 |
KWOK Oi Lung, Roy 郭凱龍 | RO | 9 | 28 November 2016 | 15 May 2018 |
KWOK Oi Lung, Roy 郭凱龍 | RO | 4 | 28 November 2016 | 15 May 2018 |
LAM Yiu Sum 林耀森 | RE | 9 | 23 May 2018 | 31 August 2019 |
LAM Yiu Sum 林耀森 | RE | 4 | 23 May 2018 | 31 August 2019 |
LEE Janice Yuan Rong 李元容 | RE | 9 | 14 October 2020 | 28 February 2022 |
LEE Janice Yuan Rong 李元容 | RE | 4 | 14 October 2020 | 28 February 2022 |
LEE Vizor 李卓蔚 | RO | 9 | 22 June 2018 | 29 September 2019 |
LEE Vizor 李卓蔚 | RE | 9 | 21 May 2018 | 22 June 2018 |
LEE Vizor 李卓蔚 | RE | 4 | 21 May 2018 | 22 June 2018 |
LEE Vizor 李卓蔚 | RO | 4 | 22 June 2018 | 29 September 2019 |
LEI Shuxun 雷舒勳 | RE | 9 | 23 April 2019 | 06 June 2019 |
LEI Shuxun 雷舒勳 | RE | 4 | 23 April 2019 | 06 June 2019 |
LEUNG Felix Tingtsun 梁廷溱 | RE | 9 | 10 May 2017 | 23 July 2018 |
LEUNG Felix Tingtsun 梁廷溱 | RE | 4 | 10 May 2017 | 23 July 2018 |
LEUNG Hon Fai, Kevin 梁漢輝 | RO | 9 | 28 November 2016 | 22 June 2018 |
LEUNG Hon Fai, Kevin 梁漢輝 | RO | 4 | 28 November 2016 | 22 June 2018 |
LI Ying Wah 李應華 | RO | 9 | 04 June 2019 | |
LI Ying Wah 李應華 | RO | 4 | 04 June 2019 | |
LIANG Bing 梁冰 | RE | 9 | 29 November 2019 | 07 April 2022 |
LIANG Bing 梁冰 | RE | 4 | 29 November 2019 | 07 April 2022 |
LOK Pui Yi 駱貝怡 | RO | 4 | 21 May 2018 | 31 May 2019 |
LOK Pui Yi 駱貝怡 | RO | 9 | 21 May 2018 | 31 May 2019 |
LOK Pui Yi 駱貝怡 | RE | 9 | 28 November 2016 | 21 May 2018 |
LOK Pui Yi 駱貝怡 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2016 | 21 May 2018 |
NG Francis Chi Yin 吳旨賢 | RE | 9 | 10 May 2017 | 01 June 2018 |
NG Francis Chi Yin 吳旨賢 | RE | 4 | 10 May 2017 | 01 June 2018 |
SIU Shui Wai 蕭穗維 | RO | 9 | 26 April 2023 | |
SIU Shui Wai 蕭穗維 | RO | 4 | 26 April 2023 | |
SIU Shui Wai 蕭穗維 | RE | 9 | 05 January 2022 | 26 April 2023 |
SIU Shui Wai 蕭穗維 | RE | 4 | 05 January 2022 | 26 April 2023 |
SIU Shui Wai 蕭穗維 | RE | 9 | 04 October 2018 | 09 August 2019 |
SIU Shui Wai 蕭穗維 | RE | 4 | 04 October 2018 | 09 August 2019 |
WANG Xuegang 王學剛 | RE | 4 | 14 March 2018 | 31 July 2018 |
WANG Xuegang 王學剛 | RE | 9 | 14 March 2018 | 31 July 2018 |
WANG Yuan 王元 | RE | 4 | 04 October 2019 | 05 October 2020 |
WANG Yuan 王元 | RE | 9 | 04 October 2019 | 05 October 2020 |
WEN Jie 溫潔 | RE | 4 | 11 February 2019 | 18 May 2020 |
WEN Jie 溫潔 | RE | 9 | 11 February 2019 | 18 May 2020 |
WU Xiyang 吳晞陽 | RE | 9 | 04 January 2017 | 15 March 2018 |
WU Xiyang 吳晞陽 | RE | 4 | 04 January 2017 | 15 March 2018 |
WU ZISANG 吳梓桑 | RE | 9 | 26 June 2019 | 31 August 2020 |
WU ZISANG 吳梓桑 | RE | 4 | 26 June 2019 | 31 August 2020 |
XU Chongfan 許崇凡 | RE | 9 | 04 January 2017 | 19 January 2018 |
XU Chongfan 許崇凡 | RE | 4 | 04 January 2017 | 19 January 2018 |
XU FAN 許帆 | RE | 4 | 27 September 2021 | |
XU FAN 許帆 | RE | 9 | 27 September 2021 | |
XU Jia 徐佳 | RE | 4 | 15 May 2018 | 30 September 2023 |
XU Jia 徐佳 | RE | 9 | 15 May 2018 | 30 September 2023 |
YOU Na 尤娜 | RE | 9 | 18 July 2017 | 28 February 2018 |
YOU Na 尤娜 | RE | 4 | 18 July 2017 | 28 February 2018 |
YU Surong 余素容 | RE | 9 | 23 March 2018 | 10 July 2018 |
YU Surong 余素容 | RE | 4 | 23 March 2018 | 10 July 2018 |
YUAN Pengcheng 袁鹏程 | RO | 9 | 17 June 2019 | 11 April 2021 |
YUAN Pengcheng 袁鹏程 | RO | 4 | 17 June 2019 | 11 April 2021 |
ZHANG Chenyuan 张辰源 | RE | 9 | 01 August 2023 | |
ZHANG Chenyuan 张辰源 | RE | 4 | 01 August 2023 | |
ZHANG Wenshuang 張文爽 | RE | 4 | 09 September 2022 | |
ZHANG Wenshuang 張文爽 | RE | 9 | 09 September 2022 | |
ZHAO Mei 趙媚 | RE | 9 | 20 July 2017 | 15 September 2017 |
ZHAO Mei 趙媚 | RE | 4 | 20 July 2017 | 15 September 2017 |
ZHU Fangming 朱方明 | RO | 4 | 19 April 2021 | 27 April 2023 |
ZHU Fangming 朱方明 | RO | 9 | 19 April 2021 | 27 April 2023 |