SFC Licences of YU Yue 于悅
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 03 April 2014 | 15 September 2015 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 April 2014 | 15 September 2015 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 21 January 2011 | 01 March 2014 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 January 2011 | 01 March 2014 |