SFC Licences of TANG Siu Chung 鄧肇宗
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
ASA Securities Limited 富國證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 04 May 2012 | 11 May 2012 |
SynerWealth Financial Limited 匯心金融有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 September 2011 | 20 February 2012 |
Nerico Brothers Limited | RE | 1 | 28 February 2011 | 15 June 2011 |