SFC Licences of LIU Beiqi 劉貝琪
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2012 | 28 September 2013 |
South China Research Limited 南華資料研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 14 November 2011 | 06 August 2013 |