SFC Licenceholders of South China Research Limited 南華資料研究有限公司
- sccompliance@sctrade.com
- Website
- www.sctrade.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AU Chi Ming 歐智明 | RE | 4 | 29 October 2015 | 11 December 2015 |
CAO Wenjia 曹雯佳 | RE | 4 | 08 September 2015 | 30 November 2018 |
CHAM Tak Fat 湛德發 | RE | 4 | 08 November 2022 | 19 January 2023 |
CHAN Chau Kam 陳周金 | RE | 4 | 28 June 2016 | 30 November 2016 |
CHAN Chun Kit 陳俊傑 | RE | 4 | 21 November 2018 | 06 March 2020 |
CHAN Hing Wah 陳慶華 | RO | 4 | 28 September 2011 | 30 June 2014 |
CHAN Janice Wing Yee 陳穎怡 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2016 | 28 February 2018 |
CHAN Ka Lai 陳家澧 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2009 | 23 November 2009 |
CHAN Kin Yan 陳建因 | RE | 4 | 14 November 2016 | 06 March 2020 |
CHAN Kon Kau 陳幹球 | RE | 4 | 09 July 2019 | 20 December 2019 |
CHAN Lai Suen 陳麗璇 | RO | 4 | 25 April 2017 | 21 November 2019 |
CHAN Lai Suen 陳麗璇 | RE | 4 | 12 October 2016 | 25 April 2017 |
CHAN Lap Chung 陳立中 | RO | 4 | 20 March 2017 | 15 January 2018 |
CHAN Lap Chung 陳立中 | RE | 4 | 04 January 2017 | 20 March 2017 |
CHAN Po Yan 陳寶欣 | RE | 4 | 18 September 2017 | 11 August 2019 |
CHAN Raymond Ho Ming 陳浩銘 | RE | 4 | 25 January 2008 | 20 September 2008 |
CHAN Tsz Yeung, Jacky 陳子揚 | RE | 4 | 14 July 2008 | 18 July 2008 |
CHAN Tze Wang 陳子宏 | RE | 4 | 03 May 2018 | 11 August 2019 |
CHAN Ying Kit 陳英傑 | RE | 4 | 24 July 2019 | 18 February 2020 |
CHEN David Wai Chung 陳維忠 | RE | 4 | 06 February 2017 | 27 April 2018 |
CHEN Yuan 陳遠 | RE | 4 | 15 July 2005 | 08 April 2006 |
CHENG Andes 鄭安達 | RE | 4 | 16 March 2005 | 21 November 2006 |
CHENG Wai Yang 鄭韋欣 | RE | 4 | 23 August 2010 | 15 November 2010 |
CHEUNG Chi Wing 張志永 | RE | 4 | 30 May 2003 | 07 October 2004 |
CHEUNG Choi Ngor 張賽娥 | RO | 4 | 03 December 2008 | |
CHEUNG Wai Kwok, Gary 張為國 | RO | 4 | 22 September 2009 | 09 June 2011 |
CHING Man Wai, Raymond 程文偉 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2006 | 02 January 2008 |
CHIU Chun Lung 趙駿龍 | RE | 4 | 28 February 2022 | |
CHIU Chun Pong 趙振邦 | RO | 4 | 19 February 2019 | 19 July 2019 |
CHIU Chun Pong 趙振邦 | RE | 4 | 09 September 2015 | 19 February 2019 |
CHIU Yu Ting 趙宇婷 | RE | 4 | 10 April 2006 | 23 November 2009 |
CHOI Kien Lun, Kevin 蔡建倫 | RE | 4 | 30 October 2017 | 27 November 2017 |
CHOI Wing Kai, Kaiser 蔡榮楷 | RO | 4 | 16 November 2015 | 11 April 2016 |
CHOI Wing Kai, Kaiser 蔡榮楷 | RE | 4 | 18 February 2010 | 16 November 2015 |
CHOI Wing Kai, Kaiser 蔡榮楷 | RE | 4 | 19 December 2005 | 06 August 2007 |
CHOW Ching In 周靜姸 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2016 | 19 August 2016 |
CHU Chia Hsien 朱家軒 | RE | 4 | 25 September 2006 | 30 September 2008 |
DAI Shi 戴十 | RE | 4 | 27 February 2014 | 31 August 2015 |
DENG Xueyan 鄧雪嫣 | RE | 4 | 24 July 2019 | 31 January 2023 |
FUNG Fang Shun 馮昉淳 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2016 | 30 November 2016 |
FUNG Koon Wah 馮冠華 | RO | 4 | 11 February 2015 | 28 December 2015 |
GE Yang 葛暘 | RE | 4 | 19 September 2016 | 22 November 2016 |
GORGES Richard Howard | RE | 4 | 29 November 2007 | 22 December 2009 |
GORGES Richard Howard | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 21 December 2007 |
GORGES Richard Howard | RO | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 31 January 2005 |
GORGES Richard Howard | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 31 January 2005 |
GU Yi Fan | RE | 4 | 31 October 2016 | 03 March 2017 |
HO Wai Leung 何偉樑 | RE | 4 | 07 January 2019 | 04 October 2019 |
HOU Ho Wan 侯晧贇 | RE | 4 | 21 January 2019 | 31 March 2020 |
IP Wai Lun, William 葉偉倫 | RE | 4 | 11 March 2009 | 23 November 2009 |
JIANG Danqing 蔣丹清 | RE | 4 | 26 February 2019 | 30 April 2020 |
JU Linlin 具霖臨 | RE | 4 | 26 July 2018 | 06 March 2020 |
KIM Yong Moon | RO | 4 | 03 July 2017 | 08 December 2017 |
KIM Yong Moon | RE | 4 | 09 May 2017 | 03 July 2017 |
KO Ming Shan 高明山 | RO | 4 | 07 January 2019 | 06 November 2020 |
KO Ming Shan 高明山 | RE | 4 | 09 July 2018 | 07 January 2019 |
KONG Chun Mui 江春梅 | RE | 4 | 05 May 2022 | |
KWOK Hiu Fu 郭曉芙 | RE | 4 | 15 July 2016 | 19 July 2019 |
LAI Kai Yiu 賴繼堯 | RE | 4 | 23 June 2006 | 15 October 2008 |
LAI Wing Yin 黎穎彥 | RE | 4 | 16 January 2018 | 13 July 2018 |
LAM Ho Bun 林濠斌 | RE | 4 | 06 August 2019 | 28 January 2020 |
LAM Cheuk Ho 林卓豪 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2012 | 24 December 2012 |
LAM Chi Fu 林志富 | RE | 4 | 10 April 2006 | 31 May 2007 |
LAM Chung Yin 林仲賢 | RE | 4 | 21 November 2018 | 18 February 2020 |
LAU Wing Hong 劉永康 | RE | 4 | 22 December 2017 | 18 February 2020 |
LAU Yau Leong 劉友亮 | RE | 4 | 26 May 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
LAU Yau Leong 劉友亮 | RE | 4 | 15 December 2016 | 16 January 2017 |
LAW Mang Kwan 羅孟君 | RO | 4 | 12 October 2015 | 09 January 2016 |
LEE Cheuk Yu, Charles 李卓瑜 | RE | 4 | 09 October 2015 | 14 July 2017 |
LEE Chun Him 李俊謙 | RE | 4 | 22 December 2016 | 11 August 2019 |
LEUNG Chor Ming 梁礎銘 | RE | 4 | 20 April 2006 | 03 May 2006 |
LEUNG Ka Man 梁家文 | RO | 4 | 11 September 2017 | 10 June 2019 |
LI King Hei, James 李敬禧 | RE | 4 | 24 June 2016 | 28 July 2017 |
LI Ran 李然 | RE | 4 | 27 October 2016 | 31 July 2017 |
LIM John Barclay 林坤海 | RO | 4 | 09 February 2009 | 01 June 2010 |
LIU Beiqi 劉貝琪 | RE | 4 | 14 November 2011 | 06 August 2013 |
LIU Yiming 劉一鳴 | RE | 4 | 16 June 2020 | 20 July 2020 |
LO Kin Kee 盧建基 | RE | 4 | 29 July 2008 | 14 October 2008 |
LOK Suen Hong 駱遜康 | RE | 4 | 15 March 2006 | 06 July 2008 |
LOK Wan Wai, Sam 駱穩威 | RE | 4 | 10 April 2006 | 23 November 2009 |
LUI Tin Shun 呂天舜 | RE | 4 | 13 October 2015 | 11 August 2019 |
LUK Wai Sum 陸偉琛 | RE | 4 | 09 September 2015 | 11 August 2019 |
LUK Wing Ki 陸頴琪 | RE | 4 | 26 May 2017 | 09 April 2018 |
MA Hsiao-hung, Alisha 馬奕彤 | RE | 4 | 31 July 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
MA Hsiao-hung, Alisha 馬奕彤 | RO | 4 | 17 July 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
MAN Kong Yui 文剛銳 | RO | 4 | 28 August 2009 | 16 January 2011 |
MAN Kong Yui 文剛銳 | RE | 4 | 20 July 2009 | 28 August 2009 |
MOK Ho Nam 莫灝楠 | RO | 4 | 21 March 2024 | |
MOK Ho Nam 莫灝楠 | RE | 4 | 21 February 2023 | 21 March 2024 |
NG Wing Tai 吳永泰 | RE | 4 | 29 March 2010 | 30 August 2014 |
NG Yuk Fung, Peter 吳旭峰 | RE | 4 | 28 April 2006 | 31 August 2009 |
NGAI Tak Shun 倪德順 | RE | 4 | 15 December 2016 | 21 August 2019 |
OR Kin 柯堅 | RE | 4 | 18 September 2015 | 12 February 2016 |
PAO Chi King, Kim 包子敬 | RE | 4 | 24 July 2003 | 24 October 2003 |
PONG Kwok Hung, Patrick 龐國鴻 | RO | 4 | 02 March 2017 | 09 August 2020 |
PONG Kwok Hung, Patrick 龐國鴻 | RE | 4 | 18 November 2016 | 02 March 2017 |
PONG Kwok Hung, Patrick 龐國鴻 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 05 September 2007 |
PONG Kwok Hung, Patrick 龐國鴻 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2004 |
PONG Kwok Hung, Patrick 龐國鴻 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2004 |
POON Yin Ling 潘燕玲 | RE | 4 | 10 March 2017 | 15 May 2018 |
POON Yuk Ki 潘玉琪 | RO | 4 | 01 April 2008 | 13 September 2009 |
QIN Yu 秦雨 | RE | 4 | 20 June 2018 | 06 March 2020 |
SAM Chi Yung 岑智勇 | RO | 4 | 05 July 2016 | 31 October 2018 |
SAM Chi Yung 岑智勇 | RE | 4 | 26 April 2016 | 05 July 2016 |
SHIU Shu Ming 蕭恕明 | RE | 4 | 05 March 2009 | 23 November 2009 |
SHUM Ching Hei 岑政熹 | RE | 4 | 12 July 2016 | 24 November 2019 |
SO Cheuk Yin 蘇卓賢 | RE | 4 | 23 November 2004 | 16 October 2005 |
SO Hoi Yan 蘇凱恩 | RE | 4 | 08 March 2017 | 24 November 2017 |
SUEN Yi Nga 孫以雅 | RE | 4 | 24 July 2008 | 15 October 2008 |
SUN Yuen Han 孫婉嫻 | RE | 4 | 05 December 2016 | 11 February 2017 |
TAM Sin Bun 譚善斌 | RO | 4 | 09 August 2012 | 12 September 2015 |
TAM Sin Bun 譚善斌 | RE | 4 | 11 March 2008 | 09 August 2012 |
TAM Wui Chun 譚匯寯 | RE | 4 | 18 August 2016 | 24 November 2019 |
TEH Chou Yuen | RE | 4 | 15 December 2016 | 18 February 2020 |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RO | 4 | 01 June 2016 | 01 May 2023 |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RE | 4 | 20 August 2010 | 01 June 2016 |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 01 September 2007 |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 12 January 2004 |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 12 January 2004 |
TO Nga Fong 杜雅芳 | RE | 4 | 22 March 2017 | 18 February 2020 |
TSE Sze Chun 謝思進 | RE | 4 | 15 March 2007 | 18 April 2007 |
TSUI Fung, Jack 徐鋒 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 25 September 2003 |
TSUI Fung, Jack 徐鋒 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 25 September 2003 |
TSUI Fung, Jack 徐鋒 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 25 September 2003 |
TSUI Kwan 徐琨 | RE | 4 | 07 June 2017 | 18 February 2020 |
TSUI Wan Li 徐韵妮 | RE | 4 | 24 November 2017 | 11 December 2017 |
TUNG Chung Yin, Williams 童忠賢 | RE | 4 | 22 August 2018 | 02 October 2018 |
TUNG Kai Ah 董啟亞 | RO | 4 | 09 February 2022 | 04 January 2024 |
TUNG Kai Ah 董啟亞 | RE | 4 | 22 November 2021 | 09 February 2022 |
WAN Pik San 溫碧珊 | RE | 4 | 17 August 2022 | |
WANG Di | RE | 4 | 04 December 2015 | 07 January 2017 |
WANG Jiayu 王家玉 | RE | 4 | 03 April 2017 | 30 June 2017 |
WONG Chun, Rex 黃俊 | RE | 4 | 03 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 |
WONG Ding Pong, Allan 黃定邦 | RO | 4 | 24 April 2024 | |
WONG Ding Pong, Allan 黃定邦 | RE | 4 | 19 December 2016 | 18 February 2020 |
WONG Hok Ko Gordon 黃學高 | RO | 4 | 03 June 2010 | 18 September 2012 |
WONG Hok Ko Gordon 黃學高 | RE | 4 | 02 November 2009 | 03 June 2010 |
WONG Hok Ko Gordon 黃學高 | RE | 4 | 05 February 2004 | 22 May 2006 |
WONG Hok Ko Gordon 黃學高 | RO | 4 | 22 May 2006 | 22 November 2006 |
WONG Hok Ko Gordon 黃學高 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2006 | 01 December 2007 |
WONG Kei Yiu 王紀堯 | RE | 4 | 16 May 2017 | 19 December 2018 |
WONG Shin Yee, Freda 黃倩而 | RO | 4 | 15 September 2015 | 22 October 2019 |
WONG Shin Yee, Freda 黃倩而 | RE | 4 | 09 September 2015 | 15 September 2015 |
WONG Shu Cheung 黃樹祥 | RE | 4 | 20 June 2007 | 19 July 2008 |
WONG Wai Ha 黃慧霞 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2024 | 08 May 2024 |
WONG Wai Ha 黃慧霞 | RE | 4 | 20 September 2022 | 16 November 2022 |
WONG Wan Vanness 王贇 | RE | 4 | 21 November 2018 | 21 January 2019 |
WONG Wing Kwan 王榮昆 | RE | 4 | 05 December 2016 | 25 September 2019 |
WONG Yu Kai 黃宇佳 | RE | 4 | 21 December 2007 | 01 January 2008 |
WU Yinong 吳亦農 | RE | 4 | 12 April 2006 | 08 August 2006 |
YAN Han 嚴涵 | RE | 4 | 19 December 2016 | 18 January 2019 |
YANG Feng 楊峰 | RE | 4 | 08 November 2005 | 12 June 2006 |
YAU Cheuk Man 丘卓文 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 January 2005 |
YAU Cheuk Man 丘卓文 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2004 |
YAU Cheuk Man 丘卓文 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 14 January 2004 |
YEN Tai Wai, David 閻大偉 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2005 | 01 June 2007 |
YEUNG Chun Yu 楊鎮宇 | RE | 4 | 18 August 2016 | 31 December 2016 |
YEUNG Man Lung 楊文龍 | RO | 4 | 27 July 2022 | 08 March 2024 |
YEUNG Man Lung 楊文龍 | RE | 4 | 03 May 2022 | 27 July 2022 |
YEUNG Ngo Ching 楊傲正 | RE | 4 | 10 April 2017 | 30 June 2017 |
YEUNG Tsz Kin 楊子建 | RE | 4 | 21 March 2007 | 07 January 2008 |
YIM Ching Wai, Kevin 嚴政緯 | RE | 4 | 27 October 2014 | 30 April 2015 |
YIU Kwok Keung 姚國強 | RE | 4 | 02 February 2005 | 15 August 2005 |
YUEN Ka Lok, David 阮家洛 | RE | 4 | 31 December 2007 | 20 September 2008 |
YUEN Ka Lun 袁嘉麟 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2017 | 01 June 2018 |
YUNG Hung Wa 翁鴻華 | RE | 4 | 19 September 2018 | 14 January 2024 |
ZHANG Ying 張穎 | RE | 4 | 01 March 2010 | 07 January 2013 |
ZHANG Ying 張穎 | RE | 4 | 02 May 2008 | 20 September 2008 |
ZHAO Yan 赵妍 | RE | 4 | 08 November 2022 | 19 May 2023 |