SFC Licences of NG Chong Fong 吳昶鋒
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
JMC Capital HK Limited 富喬鑫資本(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 19 April 2021 | 08 April 2022 |
JMC Capital HK Limited 富喬鑫資本(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 19 April 2021 | 08 April 2022 |
JMC Capital HK Limited 富喬鑫資本(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 19 April 2021 | 08 April 2022 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 16 September 2013 | 02 September 2018 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 14 March 2013 | 02 September 2018 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 26 September 2012 | 02 September 2018 |
BOCI Securities Limited 中銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 26 September 2012 | 19 February 2013 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 12 March 2012 | 17 August 2012 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 March 2012 | 17 August 2012 |