SFC Licences of HUANG Jining 黃冀凝
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lakefront Asset Management (HK) Co., Limited 樂瑞資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 29 March 2017 | |
GF Asset Management (Hong Kong) Limited 廣發資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 24 August 2015 | 09 January 2017 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 2 | 17 June 2013 | 07 August 2015 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 17 June 2013 | 07 August 2015 |
Longrun Financial Group Limited 朗潤金融集團有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 April 2013 | 10 May 2013 |
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 June 2012 | 30 August 2012 |