SFC Licences of MA Ning 馬寧
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
MIB Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 馬銀證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 06 August 2014 | 24 February 2018 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 24 July 2012 | 16 September 2013 |