SFC Licences of WU Yunjia 吳云嘉
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cinda International Securities Limited 信達國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 June 2018 | 17 October 2019 |
Cinda International Asset Management Limited 信達國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 23 October 2015 | 17 October 2019 |
Cinda International Asset Management Limited 信達國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 23 October 2015 | 17 October 2019 |
CCB International Asset Management Limited 建銀國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 July 2012 | 14 September 2015 |
CCB International Asset Management Limited 建銀國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 11 July 2012 | 14 September 2015 |
CCB International Asset Management Limited 建銀國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 11 July 2012 | 14 September 2015 |