SFC Licences of WANG Zhusiyuan 王朱思渊
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
ALLPRO ASSET MANAGEMENT LIMITED 諾一資產管理有限公司 | RO | 9 | 04 July 2022 | |
ALLPRO ASSET MANAGEMENT LIMITED 諾一資產管理有限公司 | RO | 4 | 04 July 2022 | |
Methodology Securities (HK) Company Limited 美盛達證券(香港)有限公司 | RO | 4 | 21 January 2019 | 03 February 2021 |
Methodology Securities (HK) Company Limited 美盛達證券(香港)有限公司 | RO | 1 | 21 January 2019 | 03 February 2021 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 4 | 15 January 2016 | 28 December 2018 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 February 2013 | 28 December 2018 |