SFC Licences of LIANG Lixuan 梁莉璇
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RO | 5 | 08 March 2021 | 30 April 2024 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RO | 4 | 08 March 2021 | 30 April 2024 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RO | 2 | 08 March 2021 | 30 April 2024 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RO | 1 | 26 May 2017 | 30 April 2024 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 5 | 02 December 2013 | 13 August 2020 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 4 | 02 December 2013 | 13 August 2020 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 2 | 02 December 2013 | 13 August 2020 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 06 May 2013 | 26 May 2017 |