SFC Licences of ZHANG Qiang 張强
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
ZhongHua Finance Asset Management Co., Limited 中華金融資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 07 October 2020 | 30 November 2020 |
ZhongHua Finance Asset Management Co., Limited 中華金融資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 07 October 2020 | 30 November 2020 |
Chung Lee Securities Company Limited 眾利股票有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 October 2020 | 30 November 2020 |
ChaoShang Asset Management Limited 潮商資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 03 November 2017 | 18 August 2020 |
ChaoShang Asset Management Limited 潮商資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 03 November 2017 | 18 August 2020 |
ChaoShang Securities Limited 潮商證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 November 2017 | 18 August 2020 |
South China Investment Management Limited 南華投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 13 February 2017 | 29 June 2017 |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 09 February 2015 | 29 June 2017 |
RE | 9 | 10 December 2013 | 13 February 2017 |