SFC Licenceholders of South China Investment Management Limited 南華投資管理有限公司
- sccompliance@sctrade.com
- Website
- www.sctrade.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AU Alan 歐鴗澲 | RE | 9 | 22 June 2017 | 08 August 2019 |
CAI Ming 蔡明 | RE | 9 | 24 March 2023 | |
CHAK Wai Wing 翟偉榮 | RO | 9 | 13 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 |
CHAK Wai Wing 翟偉榮 | RE | 9 | 01 September 2023 | 13 December 2023 |
CHAM Tak Fat 湛德發 | RE | 9 | 08 November 2022 | 19 January 2023 |
CHAN Chi Keung 陳智強 | RE | 9 | 21 November 2016 | 06 January 2017 |
CHAN Chun Kit 陳俊傑 | RE | 9 | 21 November 2018 | 03 July 2020 |
CHAN Kon Kau 陳幹球 | RE | 9 | 24 July 2019 | 20 December 2019 |
CHAN Lap Chung 陳立中 | RO | 9 | 20 March 2017 | 15 January 2018 |
CHAN Man Li 陳萬里 | RE | 9 | 13 December 2017 | 19 April 2018 |
CHAN Siu Lung 陳紹龍 | RE | 9 | 07 September 2023 | 18 April 2024 |
CHAN Wah Hung 陳華雄 | RE | 9 | 20 September 2019 | 14 May 2020 |
CHAN Ying Kit 陳英傑 | RE | 9 | 03 September 2019 | 05 March 2021 |
CHEN David Wai Chung 陳維忠 | RE | 9 | 06 February 2017 | 27 April 2018 |
CHEUNG Choi Ngor 張賽娥 | RO | 9 | 03 July 2018 | |
CHEUNG Choi Ngor 張賽娥 | RE | 9 | 09 May 2018 | 03 July 2018 |
CHIU Chun Lung 趙駿龍 | RO | 9 | 22 November 2023 | |
CHIU Chun Lung 趙駿龍 | RE | 9 | 24 July 2019 | 22 November 2023 |
CHOW Chun Bong 周鎮邦 | RE | 9 | 16 December 2016 | 14 January 2021 |
FAN Kwan Ho 范君豪 | RO | 9 | 27 February 2017 | 15 November 2018 |
FAN Kwan Ho 范君豪 | RE | 9 | 22 December 2016 | 27 February 2017 |
HO Wai Leung 何偉樑 | RE | 9 | 30 November 2018 | 04 October 2019 |
HON Yi Shing 韓宜成 | RE | 9 | 07 April 2022 | 12 December 2022 |
JIE Jiangyi 揭江怡 | RE | 9 | 03 January 2020 | 07 May 2020 |
KIM Yong Moon | RO | 9 | 03 July 2017 | 08 December 2017 |
KIM Yong Moon | RE | 9 | 09 May 2017 | 03 July 2017 |
KO Ming Shan 高明山 | RO | 9 | 05 May 2023 | |
KO Ming Shan 高明山 | RE | 9 | 30 October 2018 | 05 May 2023 |
KWOK Wai Wa 郭偉華 | RE | 9 | 06 November 2020 | 17 November 2020 |
LAM Ho Bun 林濠斌 | RE | 9 | 06 August 2019 | 28 January 2020 |
LAM Chung Yin 林仲賢 | RE | 9 | 21 November 2018 | 20 March 2020 |
LAM Kin Kwan 林建均 | RE | 9 | 15 December 2016 | 30 June 2019 |
LAM Leung Kit 林亮傑 | RE | 9 | 12 March 2024 | 02 May 2024 |
LAU Yau Leong 劉友亮 | RE | 9 | 26 May 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
LAU Yau Leong 劉友亮 | RE | 9 | 15 December 2016 | 16 January 2017 |
LAW Tak Keung 羅德強 | RE | 9 | 13 September 2019 | 28 April 2022 |
LEE Chun Leung 李振樑 | RE | 9 | 09 August 2017 | 31 October 2018 |
LEE Ka Lun, Alan 李嘉倫 | RE | 9 | 05 January 2017 | 31 May 2021 |
LEI Ho Chun 李浩俊 | RE | 9 | 04 November 2019 | 18 December 2020 |
LEI Ho Chun 李浩俊 | RE | 9 | 05 March 2018 | 21 August 2019 |
LEI Ho Chun 李浩俊 | RE | 9 | 03 October 2017 | 01 December 2017 |
LEONG Chi Fung 梁智鋒 | RE | 9 | 03 August 2017 | 11 August 2017 |
LEUNG Chun Hei, Matthias 梁俊希 | RE | 9 | 11 December 2017 | 08 October 2019 |
LEUNG Ka Man 梁家文 | RO | 9 | 09 March 2018 | 10 June 2019 |
LEUNG Ka Man 梁家文 | RE | 9 | 21 November 2016 | 09 March 2018 |
LIU Xucen 劉栩岑 | RE | 9 | 23 June 2023 | |
LO Wai Tung, John 盧衛東 | RE | 9 | 12 November 2018 | 27 August 2020 |
LUI Ka Lok 雷嘉樂 | RE | 9 | 03 October 2022 | 30 June 2023 |
LUK Wing Ki 陸頴琪 | RE | 9 | 26 May 2017 | 09 April 2018 |
MA Hsiao-hung, Alisha 馬奕彤 | RE | 9 | 31 July 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
MA Hsiao-hung, Alisha 馬奕彤 | RO | 9 | 17 July 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
MOK Ho Nam 莫灝楠 | RE | 9 | 21 February 2023 | |
NG Jonathan 伍麟凱 | RE | 9 | 18 April 2024 | 28 April 2024 |
NG Shun Kong 吳淳鋼 | RE | 9 | 28 December 2023 | |
NGAI Tak Shun 倪德順 | RE | 9 | 15 December 2016 | 31 July 2022 |
POON Yin Ling 潘燕玲 | RE | 9 | 10 March 2017 | 15 May 2018 |
SO Hoi Yan 蘇凱恩 | RE | 9 | 08 March 2017 | 24 November 2017 |
SO Pak Ming 蘇柏鳴 | RO | 9 | 09 November 2016 | 31 May 2017 |
SUN Yuen Han 孫婉嫻 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2016 | 11 February 2017 |
SZE Lap Sum 施鈉森 | RE | 9 | 23 September 2019 | 14 May 2020 |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RO | 9 | 23 November 2023 | |
TEOH Tean Chai, Anthony 張展才 | RO | 9 | 09 November 2016 | 01 May 2023 |
TIAN Zhijun 田智君 | RE | 9 | 10 August 2022 | 05 March 2023 |
TSE Leong Fai 謝亮輝 | RE | 9 | 13 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 |
TSUI Wan Li 徐韵妮 | RE | 9 | 02 May 2017 | 11 December 2017 |
TUEN Hei Ching 段羲澄 | RE | 9 | 06 November 2023 | 18 April 2024 |
TUNG Chung Yin, Williams 童忠賢 | RE | 9 | 22 August 2018 | 02 October 2018 |
TUNG Kai Ah 董啟亞 | RO | 9 | 09 February 2022 | 04 January 2024 |
TUNG Kai Ah 董啟亞 | RE | 9 | 22 November 2021 | 09 February 2022 |
WONG Chun, Rex 黃俊 | RE | 9 | 03 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 |
WONG Ding Pong, Allan 黃定邦 | RO | 9 | 30 October 2017 | |
WONG Ding Pong, Allan 黃定邦 | RE | 9 | 19 December 2016 | 30 October 2017 |
WONG Ho Man, Julian 王皓民 | RE | 9 | 15 December 2016 | 03 September 2017 |
WONG Kei Yiu 王紀堯 | RE | 9 | 16 May 2017 | 19 December 2018 |
WONG Tin Lun 黃天麟 | RE | 9 | 21 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 |
WONG Wai Ha 黃慧霞 | RE | 9 | 01 February 2024 | 08 May 2024 |
WONG Wai Ha 黃慧霞 | RE | 9 | 20 September 2022 | 16 November 2022 |
WONG Wan Vanness 王贇 | RE | 9 | 21 November 2018 | 21 January 2019 |
WONG Wing Kwan 王榮昆 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2016 | 25 September 2019 |
YEUNG Man Lung 楊文龍 | RO | 9 | 19 July 2023 | 08 March 2024 |
YEUNG Man Lung 楊文龍 | RE | 9 | 24 April 2023 | 19 July 2023 |
YEUNG Man Lung 楊文龍 | RO | 9 | 27 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 |
YEUNG Man Lung 楊文龍 | RE | 9 | 03 May 2022 | 27 July 2022 |
YEUNG On Lit 楊安烈 | RE | 9 | 02 January 2019 | 08 October 2019 |
YEUNG Shu Fan 楊樹勳 | RE | 9 | 24 May 2021 | 14 July 2021 |
YONG Hou Hin 翁浩軒 | RE | 9 | 26 January 2023 | 03 March 2023 |
YUEN Ka Lun 袁嘉麟 | RE | 9 | 01 February 2017 | 01 June 2018 |
YUNG Hung Wa 翁鴻華 | RE | 9 | 19 September 2018 | 14 January 2024 |
ZHANG Qiang 張强 | RE | 9 | 13 February 2017 | 29 June 2017 |