SFC Licences of FUNG Shing Yan 馮承恩
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
STI Asset Management Limited | RE | 9 | 15 July 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
STI Asset Management Limited | RE | 4 | 15 July 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 02 April 2015 | 15 September 2015 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 02 April 2015 | 15 September 2015 |