SFC Licences of CHEUNG Wai Chiu, Paul 張偉釗
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delta Asia Securities Limited 滙業證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 08 January 2024 | 15 June 2024 |
Delta Asia Securities Limited 滙業證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 13 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 |
First Shanghai Securities Limited 第一上海證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 08 August 2022 | 15 November 2023 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 07 December 2016 | 27 May 2022 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 October 2015 | 27 May 2022 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 23 October 2015 | 27 May 2022 |